EP3325044 - MAGNETIC PRESSURE SENSING SYSTEM FOR AN INFUSION PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zevex, Inc. 4314 Zevex Park Lane Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JURETICH, Jeffery, T. 5358 Emmeline Drive Herriman, UT 84096 / US | 02 /
ELWOOD, Michael, K. 1515 Cherry Blossom Drive Farmington, UT 84025 / US | 03 /
SZCZOTKA, Daniel 5429 S Woodcrest Drive Salt Lake City, UT 84117 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Hey, Andrew Stuart Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Hey, Andrew Stuart Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2018/22] | Bishton, Amy Virginia Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15899777.5 | 24.07.2015 | [2018/22] | WO2015US41873 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017018974 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325044 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3325044 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/168, G01R33/00, G01R33/07 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A61M5/14232 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/16854 (KR,US);
A61J15/0076 (KR);
A61J15/0088 (KR);
G01R33/00 (US);
G01R33/072 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (KR);
A61M2005/16863 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2005/16868 (EP,US);
A61M2005/16872 (EP,US);
A61M2205/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/18 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | A61M5/142, A61M5/168, G01R33/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/22] | A61M5/142 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETDRUCKERFASSUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE INFUSIONSPUMPE | [2018/22] | English: | MAGNETIC PRESSURE SENSING SYSTEM FOR AN INFUSION PUMP | [2018/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION MAGNÉTIQUE DE PRESSION POUR POMPE À PERFUSION | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 04.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2015 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | LU | 24.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 24.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 24.07.2015 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4758228 (WILLIAMS DAVID R [US]) [Y] 1-9 * figure 11 *; | [Y]DE19626596 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-9* column 2, line 50 - line 66; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2005267401 (PRICE JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0044]; figure 12 * | International search | [Y]US4936760 (WILLIAMS DAVID R [US]) [Y] 1-9 * entire document *; | [Y]US4954812 (LEBRON FERNANDO C [CA]) [Y] 8, 9* entire document *; | [Y]US2004206916 (COLVIN ARTHUR E [US], et al) [Y] 4, 5 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014326568 (GIESSIBL JOHANNES [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * entire document * | by applicant | US4758228 | US4936760 |