08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
09.04.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
03.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
01.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.04.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
07.11.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
02.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
02.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
05.10.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
05.10.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
27.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
28.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
08.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
20.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|