EP3324588 - CHANNEL ESTIMATION METHOD, USER EQUIPMENT AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/21] | CHANNEL ESTIMATION METHOD, BASE STATION, USER EQUIPMENT AND SYSTEM | ||
[2023/51] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiming Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Jing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Anjian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
DAI, Xizeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
ZHAO, Yue Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
CHENG, Xingqing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/18] |
Former [2018/21] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15900756.6 | 12.08.2015 | [2018/21] | WO2015CN86779 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017024558 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324588 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3324588 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/0202 (US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W88/02 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | H04L25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANALSCHÄTZUNGSVERFAHREN, BENUTZERGERÄT UND SYSTEM | [2023/51] | English: | CHANNEL ESTIMATION METHOD, USER EQUIPMENT AND SYSTEM | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DES CANAUX, ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR, ET SYSTÈME | [2023/51] |
Former [2018/21] | KANALSCHÄTZUNGSVERFAHREN, BASISSTATION, BENUTZERGERÄT UND SYSTEM | ||
Former [2018/21] | CHANNEL ESTIMATION METHOD, BASE STATION, USER EQUIPMENT AND SYSTEM | ||
Former [2018/21] | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DES CANAUX, STATION DE BASE, ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR, ET SYSTÈME | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2018 | Translation filed | 15.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 15.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2023 | 16.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014112780 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,3,6,8,11,14,15 * abstract * [I] 2,5,7,10,13; | [XI]US2015139022 (MAZZARESE DAVID [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,11,14,15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0066]; figures 2-4 * [I] 2,5,7,10,13; | [XI]US2015180625 (PARK JONGHYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0159]; figure 8 * [I] 2,5,7,10,13; | US2015318954 [ ] (PARK JONGHYUN [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0103] *; | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on geographically separated antennas", vol. RAN WG4, no. Qingdao, China; 20120813 - 20120817, (20120806), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-124283, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_64/Docs/, (20120806), XP050671966 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]CN102215503 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * , description, page 5 *; | [Y]CN102647371 (ZTE CORP) [Y] 1-18 * , description, pages 3 and 6 *; | [A]CN102739298 (UNIV XIDIAN) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO2013070145 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-18* , the whole document * |