EP3335809 - METHOD FOR EFFECTIVELY UTILIZING ENERGY IN WASTE-INCINERATION FACILITY WITH ETHANOL PRODUCTION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Zosen Corporation 7-89, Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 559-8559 / JP | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERA, Yutaka c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | 02 /
TOMIYAMA, Shigeo c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMORI, Ken-ichi c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 15900981.0 | 10.08.2015 | [2018/25] | WO2015JP72628 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017026027 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3335809 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3335809 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, A61L2/04, A61L11/00, C01B3/22, C01B3/38, C12P7/06, B09B5/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A61L2/04 (EP);
B09B3/60 (US);
A61L11/00 (EP);
B09B3/40 (EP);
B09B5/00 (EP);
C01B3/22 (EP);
C01B3/38 (EP);
C12P7/06 (EP);
Y02E20/12 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02P20/129 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/25] | B09B3/00, A61L2/04, A61L11/00, C01B3/22, C01B3/38, C12P7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EFFEKTIVEN NUTZUNG VON ENERGIE IN EINER MÜLLVERBRENNUNGSANLAGE MIT ETHANOLHERSTELLUNGSAUSRÜSTUNG | [2018/25] | English: | METHOD FOR EFFECTIVELY UTILIZING ENERGY IN WASTE-INCINERATION FACILITY WITH ETHANOL PRODUCTION EQUIPMENT | [2018/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'UTILISER EFFICACEMENT L'ÉNERGIE DANS UNE INSTALLATION D'INCINÉRATION DE DÉCHETS AVEC UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE PRODUCTION D'ÉTHANOL | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2018 | Translation filed | 26.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 26.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2015 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | IE | 10.08.2020 | LU | 10.08.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.08.2015 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 10.08.2020 | ||
LU | 10.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 10.08.2020 | ||
LU | 10.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 10.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 10.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 10.08.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2005211805 (HITACHI KIDEN KOGYO KK) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10; | [YA]WO2007005954 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0093]; figures 1-3; claims 5,11,19,20 * [A] 2-10; | [YA]JP2008104452 (UNIV KUMAMOTO) [Y] 1 * abstract *[A] 2-10; | [YA]US2010105127 (GINSBURG MARTIN A [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0032]; claims 1,6,14,21 * [A] 2-10 | International search | [A]JPS5326768 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * , claims 1 to 5; page 1, lower right column, lines 7 to 11; page 2, upper right column, line 6 to page 4, lower right column, line 3; page 5, upper right column, line 11 to lower right column, line 18; drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS5333867 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * , claims; page 1, lower left column, lines 12 to 14; page 2, upper right column, line 17 to page 5, lower left column, line 5; drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006325577 (UNIV KUMAMOTO, et al) [A] 1-10 * , claims 1 to 3, 15, 20, 21; paragraphs [0001], [0010], [0012] to [0021], [0029], [0032] to [0061], [0075] to [0100]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]EP1829821 (ENEA ENTE NUOVE TEC [IT], et al) [A] 9, 10* , claims 1, 2, 10, 12 to 14; paragraphs [0001], [0025] to [0027], [0041] to [0061]; fig. 3, 7 & IT RM20060102 A1 *; | [A]JP2008104452 (UNIV KUMAMOTO) [A] 1-10 * , claims 13, 18 to 20; paragraphs [0001], [0008] to [0010], [0014] to [0016], [0019], [0025] to [0038], [0042] to [0067]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2010146243 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * , claims 1 to 4, 10; page 1, lines 4 to 7; page 2, line 15 to page 6, line 9; page 8, line 31 to page 10, line 17; page 12, lines 1 to 16; page 13, line 21 to page 18, line 18; page 20, lines 8 to 24; fig. 1 & EP 2443243 A1 & FI 20095691 A * |