EP3322232 - SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD AND DEVICE IN COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Man Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Hongzhuo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HU, Jun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 15901248.3 | 14.08.2015 | [2018/20] | WO2015CN87063 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017028043 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3322232 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,US);
H04W56/004 (EP,US);
H04W36/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISATIONSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2018/20] | English: | SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD AND DEVICE IN COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SYNCHRONISATION DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2018 | Translation filed | 12.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 12.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CN103797870 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * abstract * [A] 3-7,10-14; | [X]WO2015057156 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,8,15 * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 29 * * figures 4,6,9 * * page 20, line 3 - page 21, line 13 *; | US2016112978 [ ] (HU JUN [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0097] * * figures 1,3 ** paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0115] * | International search | [X]CN103797870 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-42 * , abstract, and description, paragraphs [0085]-[0235] and [0253]-[0268], and figures 1-15 *; | [X]CN103797868 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-42 * , abstract, and description, paragraphs [0083]-[0226] and [0238]-[0256], and figures 1-15 *; | [A]CN102934379 (NET INSIGHT AB) [A] 1-42 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2012184290 (KAZMI MUHAMMAD ALI [SE], et al) [A] 1-42 * , the whole document * |