Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017028051 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11706795 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2023 | B2 | US2021235490 | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815895793 | 13.02.2018 | US202117233038 | 16.04.2021 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | US202016911385 | 24.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10993258 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2021 | B2 | US2020329492 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815895793 | 13.02.2018 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | US202016911385 | 24.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10873971 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2020 | B2 | US2018176947 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6642842B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2020 | B2 | JP2018527811 | 20.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3860298 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | B1 | EP3860298 | 04.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20213386 | 14.08.2015 | EP15901256 | 14.08.2015 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117715164 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201580038872 | 14.08.2015 | CN202311497866 | 14.08.2015 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111741517 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201580038872 | 14.08.2015 | CN202010415418 | 14.08.2015 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109905910B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B | CN109905910 | 18.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201580038872 | 14.08.2015 | CN201910028789 | 14.08.2015 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107006032B | Global Dossier | 08.05.2020 | B | CN107006032 | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3324696 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | B1 | EP3324696 | 25.07.2018 | A4 | EP3324696 | 23.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2967602T | 03.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20213386 | 14.08.2015 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3324696T | 28.06.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15901256 | 14.08.2015 | WO2015CN87084 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Divisional application | EP3860298 |