EP3183040 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A USER-CONFIGURABLE ATHLETIC TRAINING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Traustason, Gudmundur, Orn 252 NW 41st Way Deerfield Beach, FL 33442 / US | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy Robert Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Parnham, Kevin Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15901843.1 | 18.08.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015US45738 | Priority number, date | US201462038433P | 18.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462038433 P | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017030568 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183040 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/00, A63B71/06, A63B24/00 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
A63B69/002 (EP,US);
A63B69/00 (EP,US);
A63B69/0053 (EP,US);
A63B71/0622 (EP,US);
A63B2024/004 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0625 (EP,US);
A63B2220/53 (EP,US);
A63B2220/56 (EP,US);
A63B2225/50 (EP,US);
A63B2225/74 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | A63B69/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BENUTZERSEITIG KONFIGURIERBARE SPORTTRAININGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A USER-CONFIGURABLE ATHLETIC TRAINING APPARATUS | [2017/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UN APPAREIL D'ENTRAINEMENT SPORTIF CONFIGURABLE PAR UN UTILISATEUR | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 07.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2022 | 31.08.2022 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2023 | 31.08.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2323297 (FOOTWALL LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0038] - [0039] - [0044] , [0046] - [0047] - [0052]; figure - *; | [Y]WO9907447 (GOERGENYI ISTVAN [HU]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2007176368 (LAMBERTI CATHERINE B [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0026] , [0028] , [0030] , [0033] , [0037]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2012302301 (HOMSI KRISTOPHER L [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0033] , [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0045] , [0052] , [0053] , [0055] , [0060] , [0062]; figures 1A,2A * | International search | [XY]WO9907447 (GOERGENYI ISTVAN [HU]) [X] 1-4, 7, 9, 11-15, 17, 19- 20 * , entire document, especially FIG. 1-4; Abstract; pg. 4, In. 13-21, pg. 5, In. 25-30, pg. 6, In. 7-19, pg. 7, In. 5-9, pg. 7, In. 24-26, pg. 9, In. 14-19 * [Y] 5-6, 8, 10, 16, 18; | [Y]US2007191141 (WEBER MARK [CA]) [Y] 5 * , entire document, especially FIG 1; para [0045] *; | [Y]US2012302301 (HOMSI KRISTOPHER L [US]) [Y] 6, 8, 10, 16, 18 * , entire document, especially FIG. 1-4; para [0031], [0032], [0037], [0045], [0046], [0062], [0074] *; | [A]US8480517 (GUETTLER CHRISTIAN RICHARD [DE]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2009069123 (NUGENT RICHARD JOSEPH JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US7645211 (THOMECZEK LAUREN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * | by applicant | US2012302301 | WO9907447 |