EP3346813 - REQUIRED PRECISION SETTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI Corporation 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu Aichi / JP | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd. 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAKAGE, Yusuke c/o FUJI Corporation 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu Aichi / JP | [2019/07] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
YAMAKAGE, Yusuke c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 15902985.9 | 01.09.2015 | [2018/28] | WO2015JP74838 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037865 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346813 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04, H05K13/08, B23P21/00 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
H05K13/0452 (EP,US);
G05B19/4184 (US);
H05K13/02 (US);
H05K13/04 (US);
H05K13/0404 (EP,US);
H05K13/0853 (EP,US);
H05K13/0882 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37605 (US);
G05B2219/45026 (US);
G05B2219/45031 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | H05K13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER ERFORDERLICHEN PRÄZISION | [2018/28] | English: | REQUIRED PRECISION SETTING DEVICE | [2018/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE DE PRÉCISION REQUISE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2018 | Translation filed | 22.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 22.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0891129 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 6 - column 10; figures 6,7; claims 3,4 *; | [A]EP1175137 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]EP1189497 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-6B,27 * [A] 4,5; | [XA]EP1876879 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-3; claims 1,5,6,7,8 * [A] 4,5 | International search | [XA]JP2771814B (Sony Corp.) [X] 1-2 * , page 3, lines 2 to 6 (Family: none) * [A] 3-5; | [A]JP2005353750 (JUKI KK) [A] 1-5* , paragraphs [0050] to [0051] & CN 1708218 A *; | [A]JP2008198726 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0075] to [0076]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP5675487B (Yamaha Motor Co., Ltd.) [X] 1 * , paragraph [0032]; fig. 3 (Family: none) * [A] 2-5 |