EP3354014 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VIDEO BROADCASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. 6/F Hkust SZ IER Bldg. 9, Yuexing 1st Road Hi Tech Park (south) Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Weifeng 6F HKUST SZ IER Bldg. No.9 Yuexing 1st Rd. Hi-Tech Park (South) Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
AI, Chuyue 6F HKUST SZ IER Bldg. No.9 Yuexing 1st Rd. Hi-Tech Park (South) Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 15904473.4 | 25.09.2015 | [2018/31] | WO2015CN90749 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017049597 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354014 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/12 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
H04N21/4126 (EP,US);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04N21/2743 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/6175 (EP,US);
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR VIDEORUNDFUNK | [2018/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VIDEO BROADCASTING | [2018/31] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DIFFUSION VIDÉO | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 16.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 08.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012192239 (HARWELL MARK A [US], et al); | [E]WO2017048168 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]); | International search | [A]US2012212570 (HERZ ERIK [US], et al); | [A]US2012237028 (KHAZAN ROGER [US], et al); | [A]CN103561244 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMM CO LTD); | [X]US2015168144 (BARTON JASON [US], et al) | by applicant | US2012192239 | US2015168144 |