|
27.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Letter relating to refund instructions (deposit account) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
59 |