13.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.12.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.09.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2020 |
First examination report |
|
20.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.12.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
17.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] |
11.05.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
30.11.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
14.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
11.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.04.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
23.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|