EP3357046 - SOUND GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAVOLAINEN, Teemu Manttaalimutka 18 B 4 37120 Nokia / FI | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 15905275.2 | 29.09.2015 | [2018/32] | WO2015FI50645 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017055675 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357046 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08B3/10, G08B19/00, G08B21/02, G08B21/08, G08B23/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
G08B21/182 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
G08B21/02 (EP,US);
G08B3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | TONERZEUGUNG | [2018/32] | English: | SOUND GENERATION | [2018/32] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE SON | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 23.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007077534 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,15 * page 1, line 18 - line 31 * * page 2, line 26 - line 33 * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 17 * * page 6, line 1 - line 14 *[I] 4,8-14; | [XI]US2009002179 (JENNEWINE R CURTIS [US]) [X] 1-8,15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0065] * * figure - * [I] 9-14 | International search | [XY]US5451930 (MCDANIEL STEVEN M [US]) [X] 1, 3-4, 8, 14, 16-18, 20-21, 25, 31, 33 * abstract; Fig. 1; col.1, II. 10-51, col.5, 1.4 - col.8, 1.29 as above * [Y] 2, 9, 11-12, 15, 19, 26, 28-29, 32; | [X]US5801633 (SONI GOVIND [US]) [X] 1, 5, 16-18, 22, 33 * abstract; Figs. 3, 4; column 2, lines 23-60, col.5, 1.14 - col.6, 1.24; claim 1 *; | [A]US5589824 (LYNCH ADAM Q [US]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [Y] - YAN H. et al., "Wireless sensor network based E-health system - implementation and experimental results", IEEE Trans. on Consumer Electronics, (20101100), vol. 56, no. 4, pages 2288 - 2295, XP011341821 [Y] 2, 9, 11-12, 15, 19, 26, 28-29, 32 * Fig. 3; Section IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2010.5681102 | [A] - LANG W. et al., "The 'Intelligent Container' - a cognitive sensor network for transport management", IEEE Sensors Journal, (20110300), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 688 - 698, XP011344046 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2010.2060480 | by applicant | US2009002179 | WO2007077534 |