EP3358748 - CODING PROGRAM, CODING METHOD, CODING DEVICE, DECODING PROGRAM, DECODING METHOD AND DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAOKA, Masahiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 15905480.8 | 02.10.2015 | [2018/32] | WO2015JP78120 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017056327 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358748 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3358748 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/40, H03M7/12 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
H03M7/40 (EP,US);
H03M7/12 (US);
H03M7/4037 (EP,US);
H03M7/4068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CODIERUNGSPROGRAMM, CODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, CODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DECODIERUNGSPROGRAMM, DECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND DECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | CODING PROGRAM, CODING METHOD, CODING DEVICE, DECODING PROGRAM, DECODING METHOD AND DECODING DEVICE | [2018/32] | French: | PROGRAMME, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE, PROGRAMME, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2018 | Translation filed | 28.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2015 | AL | 11.05.2022 | AT | 11.05.2022 | CY | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | ES | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | IT | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | MK | 11.05.2022 | MT | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | TR | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | IE | 02.10.2022 | LU | 02.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
TR | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
IT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "Data Compression Techniques", internet article, (20150203), URL: https://www.cs.helsinki.fi/u/puglisi/dct2015/slides3.pdf, (20180817), XP002783950 [X] 1-8 * page 20 - page 21 * * page 15 - page 16 * | [X] - "Elias gamma coding", Wikipedia, (20141215), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Elias_gamma_coding&oldid=638126020, (20180817), XP002783951 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS54156446 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS62298280 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-8* , entire text; all drawings & US 4811113 A * |