EP3369543 - WIRE REPLACEMENT DEVICE AND WIRE REPLACEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | For all designated states IHI Logistics & Machinery Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Hirotomo c/o IHI Logistics & Machinery Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | 02 /
SAKO, Naoto c/o IHI Logistics & Machinery Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2018/41] |
Former [2018/39] | 01 /
MAEDA, Hirotomo c/o IHI Machinery and Furnace Co. Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-6009 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKO, Naoto c/o IHI Machinery and Furnace Co. Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-6009 / JP | |||
Former [2018/36] | 01 /
MAEDA Hirotomo c/o IHI Machinery and Furnace Co. Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-6009 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKO Naoto c/o IHI Machinery and Furnace Co. Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-6009 / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/22] |
Former [2018/36] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15907312.1 | 30.10.2015 | [2018/36] | WO2015JP80721 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017072948 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369543 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3369543 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/24, B29C43/28, B29D30/38, B65H69/00, B29C43/34 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B29C43/34 (EP);
B29C43/24 (EP,KR);
B29C43/00 (EP);
B29C43/28 (EP,KR);
B29D30/38 (EP,KR);
B65H69/00 (EP);
B29C2043/3422 (EP);
B29D2030/0038 (KR);
B29D2030/381 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | B29C43/24, B29C43/28, B29D30/38, B65H69/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/36] | B29C43/24, B29C43/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTERSATZVORRICHTUNG UND DRAHTERSATZVERFAHREN | [2018/36] | English: | WIRE REPLACEMENT DEVICE AND WIRE REPLACEMENT METHOD | [2018/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REMPLACEMENT DE FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLACEMENT DE FIL | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2018 | Translation filed | 22.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 22.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2015 | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CY | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | MK | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | TR | 01.06.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | GB | 30.10.2022 | IE | 30.10.2022 | LU | 30.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | FR | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 30.10.2015 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
MK | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
GB | 30.10.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 30.10.2015 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
GB | 30.10.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.10.2015 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
GB | 30.10.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
GB | 30.10.2022 | ||
IE | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
GB | 30.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
LU | 30.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]DD205849 (CREMER ULRICH, et al) [I] 1-5,9-14 * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 3; figure - * [A] 6-8,15,16; | [E]EP3124196 (COMERC INT S R L [IT]) [E] 1,3-5,9* paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0034] , [0035] , [0048] , [0053] , [0 54] , [0057]; figure - * | International search | [Y]JPH06320628 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-3, 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0007], [0013] to [0019]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000136488 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-16 * , claims; paragraphs [0003] to [0009], [0016] to [0033]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2007010599 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3, 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0009] to [0022], [0024] to [0034], [0039] to [0041], [0044] to [0045]; fig. 1 to 11 & US 2009/0249598 A1 paragraphs [0009] to [0024], [0027] to [0036], [0041] to [0043], [0046] to [0047]; fig. 1 to 11 *; | [A]JP2008272966 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-16* , paragraphs [0007] to [0010]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * |