EP3370328 - ELECTRIC MOTOR, BLOWER AND AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OYA, Junichiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
OIKAWA, Tomoaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Mineo c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
ISHII, Hiroyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
ASO, Hiroki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 06 /
URABE, Yuto c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 07 /
HATAKEYAMA, Kazunori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 08 /
SHIMOMUGI, Takuya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | 01 /
OYA, Junichiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
OIKAWA, Tomoaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAMOTO, Mineo c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
ISHII, Hiroyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
05 /
ASO, Hiroki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
06 /
URABE, Yuto c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
07 /
HATAKEYAMA, Kazunori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
08 /
SHIMOMUGI, Takuya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 15907329.5 | 30.10.2015 | [2018/36] | WO2015JP80794 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017072965 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3370328 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K29/08, H02P6/16, F24F11/88, H02K11/33, H02K5/08, H02P6/08, H02P6/15, H02P6/17 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
H02P6/17 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (US);
F24F11/88 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K29/08 (EP,US);
H02K5/08 (EP,US);
H02P27/085 (US);
H02P6/153 (EP,US);
H02P6/30 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | H02K29/08, H02P6/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR, GEBLÄSE UND KLIMAANLAGE | [2018/36] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR, BLOWER AND AIR CONDITIONER | [2018/36] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE, SOUFFLANTE ET CLIMATISEUR | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2018 | Translation filed | 04.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 04.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2000069788 (CALSONIC CORP) [I] 1-4,8,9 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1a,1b * * paragraph [0028]; figure 9a * * paragraph [0032]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0033]; figure 11 * * paragraph [0038] * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]JP2001045787 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0065]; figures 2,5 *; | [Y]US2010195784 (HIRATA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 6* paragraph [0040]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2000069788 (CALSONIC CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0019], [0032] to [0034]; fig. 1, 10 to 11 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010028892 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraph [0039]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015171200 (HITACHI POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0064] to [0069]; fig. 7 to 9 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015089198 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 4-9 * , paragraphs [0025] to [0026]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2001045787 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [Y] 5-9 * , paragraphs [0055] to [0065]; fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007074796 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 6-9 * , paragraphs [0004] to [0009], [0024] to [0028] (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2013183168 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * , paragraphs [0047] to [0055]; fig. 6 & US 2015/0121929 A1 paragraphs [0061] to [0069]; fig. 6 & JP 5791798 B2 * |