EP3337956 - TRANSCEIVER WITH ANNULAR RING OF HIGH MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY MATERIAL FOR ENHANCED SHORT HOP COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Jin 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Glenn, Andrew 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 15907456.6 | 28.10.2015 | [2018/26] | WO2015US57818 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074353 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337956 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/13 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
E21B47/13 (EP,US);
E21B17/003 (US);
E21B47/013 (EP);
E21B47/017 (EP,US);
F16L25/02 (US);
E21B4/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | E21B47/12, E21B47/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | SENDER-EMPFÄNGER MIT RING AUS MATERIAL MIT HOHER MAGNETISCHER PERMEABILITÄT FÜR VERBESSERTE SHORT-HOP-KOMMUNIKATION | [2018/26] | English: | TRANSCEIVER WITH ANNULAR RING OF HIGH MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY MATERIAL FOR ENHANCED SHORT HOP COMMUNICATIONS | [2018/26] | French: | ÉMETTEUR-RÉCEPTEUR AVEC BAGUE ANNULAIRE DE MATÉRIAU À HAUTE PERMÉABILITÉ MAGNÉTIQUE POUR COMMUNICATIONS PAR BOND COURT AMÉLIORÉES | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 21.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006208738 (MOORE ROBERT A [US]); | [XI]US2015002307 (GRAF STEPHAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2015031973 (EVOLUTION ENGINEERING INC [CA]) | International search | [A]US5160925 (DAILEY PATRICK E [US], et al); | [A]US2008211687 (PRICE TIMOTHY M [US], et al); | [A]US2010033344 (ROZENBLIT VLAD [US], et al); | [A]US2011234230 (BITTAR MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [X]US2015002307 (GRAF STEPHAN [US], et al) |