EP3368276 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT GENERATION PARAMETER DESCRIPTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOROVIC, Peter Cami de Can Graells 1-21 E-08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 02 /
MOROVIC, Jan 42 Scythe Way Colchester Essex CO3 4SJ / GB | 03 /
BENNING, Paul, J. 1070 NE Circle Boulevard Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2018/36] | Franks, Adam Peter HP France SAS IP Section - Legal Department 5 avenue Raymond Chanas 38053 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 15907506.8 | 30.10.2015 | [2018/36] | WO2015US58232 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074413 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3368276 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3368276 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, B33Y50/00, B33Y50/02, H04N1/40 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
B29C64/386 (EP,US);
G06F30/23 (US);
B29C64/393 (US);
G06T17/10 (US);
H04N1/40 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | B29C67/00, B33Y50/00, B33Y50/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHREIBUNGEN VON DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTERZEUGUNGSPARAMETERN | [2018/36] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT GENERATION PARAMETER DESCRIPTIONS | [2018/36] | French: | DESCRIPTIONS DE PARAMÈTRES DE PRODUCTION D'OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 23.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2015 | AL | 29.12.2021 | AT | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | DK | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | IT | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | MT | 29.12.2021 | NL | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SE | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 30.10.2015 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 30.10.2015 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.10.2015 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2015106844 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0 26] - [0028] - [0 34] , [0 42] , [0 48] - [0049] *; | [XI]WO2015106816 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0073] - [0079] *[I] 10,11,15; | [E]WO2016171717 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0067] *; | [E]WO2016169620 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0 16] , [0 17] , [0 21] - [0023] *; | [E]WO2016171719 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0017] - [0022] * | International search | [A]JP2004514053 (CONCEPT LASER GMBH) [A] 1-15* See abstract; paragraphs [0037]-[0045]; figures 1 and 4-6. *; | [A]JP2006513055 (ARCAM AB) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; paragraphs [0034]-[0036]; figures 4-6. *; | [A]US2006239588 (HULL CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; paragraphs [0034]-[0037]; figures 1-4. *; | [A]EP1894704 (3D SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0047]; claims 1-4; figures 6-11, 14 and 15. *; | [A]US2014306380 (EL-SIBLANI ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; paragraphs [0221]-[0274]; figures 11A-12. * |