EP3373826 - ENDOSCOPIC REPOSABLE SURGICAL CLIP APPLIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhihua Room A-2207 Fenghuangshiji 168 Dayang Road Baoanfuyong District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
HU, Encheng Anthony Floor 6, No. 3 No. 2388 Chenhang Road Minhang District Shanghai 201114 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhihua Room A-2207 Fenghuangshiji 168 Dayang Road Baoanfuyong District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | ||
02 /
HU, Encheng Anthony Floor 6, No. 3 No. 2388 Chenhang Road Minhang District Shanghai 201114 / CN | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 15908020.9 | 10.11.2015 | [2018/38] | WO2015CN94172 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017079890 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373826 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128, // A61B17/00 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B2017/0023 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (US);
A61B2017/00469 (US);
A61B2017/00902 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/38] | A61B17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPISCHER AUSTAUSCHBARER APPLIKATOR VON CHIRURGISCHEN KLAMMERN | [2018/38] | English: | ENDOSCOPIC REPOSABLE SURGICAL CLIP APPLIER | [2018/38] | French: | APPLICATEUR ENDOSCOPIQUE D'AGRAFES CHIRURGICALES À NOMBRE D'UTILISATIONS LIMITÉ | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 08.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4557263 (GREEN DAVID T [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5542949 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0793944 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5833700 (FOGELBERG MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2015196298 (MENN PAVEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2003014060 (WILSON DON [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]EP1468653 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101836875 (TYCO HEALTHCARE) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103190939 (COVIDIEN LP) [A] 1-21 * description, pragraphs [0010], [0137]-[0183] and figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP2263570 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |