EP3386898 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TESTING THE CAR STRUCTURES OF AN ELEVATOR AND/OR FOR ADJUSTING A LOAD WEIGHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAPANIEMI, Markku Humalniementie 16 A 4 00840 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
KATTAINEN, Ari Tiilitehtaantie 9 05830 Hyvinkää / FI | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 15910147.6 | 07.12.2015 | [2018/42] | WO2015FI50858 | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017098077 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3386898 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B1/34, G01G19/14, G01L1/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B66B5/0087 (EP,US);
B66B1/3476 (EP,US);
B66B5/0037 (EP,US);
G01G19/14 (EP,US);
G01L5/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | B66B1/34, B66B5/00, B66B5/14, B66B5/18, G01G19/14, G01L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM TESTEN DER KABINENSTRUKTUREN EINES AUFZUGS UND/ODER ZUM EINSTELLEN EINER LASTWIEGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/42] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR TESTING THE CAR STRUCTURES OF AN ELEVATOR AND/OR FOR ADJUSTING A LOAD WEIGHING DEVICE | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR TESTER LES STRUCTURES DE CABINE D'UN ASCENSEUR ET/OU POUR AJUSTER UN DISPOSITIF DE PESÉE DE CHARGE | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 29.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO2007075225 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [X] 13-15,17,24,25,29 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 12,27,28 [Y] 1-11 [I] 16,18-23,26,30; | [XAYI]WO2008071301 (TUEV NORD SYSTEMS GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 13-15,17,25,28,29 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 10 * * page 9, line 14 - page 12, line 20 * * figure 2 * [A] 8,12,24,27 [Y] 1-7,9-11 [I] 16,18-23,26,30; | [YA]WO2015001191 (KONE CORP [FI]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * [A] 12-30; | [A]WO2013110862 (KONE CORP [FI]) [A] 1-30 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]WO2007075225 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [X] 1-11, 13-26, 28-30 * abstract; paragraphs [0028-0030,0034-0037]; figures 1 and 4 *; | [X]JP2004099303 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) [X] 1, 13 * & abstract [online] EPOQUENET EPODOC & WPI; figure 1; machine translation by TXPJPEA-EPO: "Description of symbols" *; | [X]JP2005145620 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN) [X] 1, 13 * & abstract [online] EPOQUENET EPODOC & WPI; figure 1; machine translation by TXPJPEA-EPO *; | [X]WO2008071301 (TUEV NORD SYSTEMS GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 7 line 19 - page 8 line 14; page 9 line 14 - page 10 line 24; "Bezugszeichenliste" on page 12; figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO2012007457 (AIP APS [DK], et al) [X] 1 * page 5 line 24 - page 7 line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5917478 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 0 * figures 6-7 *; | [A]DE10042724 (TECH UEBERWACHUNGS VER HANNOVE [DE]) [A] 0 * & abstract [online] EPOQUENET EPODOC & WPI; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2013182742 (KONE CORP [FI]) [A] 0 * abstract; figure 1 * |