EP3393609 - HYBRID SNOWSHOE-SKI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faber Et Cie Inc. 2923 rue de la Faune Québec, Québec G2A 3W8 / CA | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FABER, Guy 4499 Jordi-Bonet Québec, Québec G2A 4G9 / CA | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP - MC/EP 17, avenue Albert II C/º The Office & Co - L'ALBU 98000 Monaco / MC | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Hautier IP 1, Rue du Gabian Le Thalès - 12 Etg - Bloc A 98000 Monaco / MC | Application number, filing date | 15910984.2 | 24.12.2015 | [2018/44] | WO2015CA51380 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106954 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393609 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 29.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63C13/00, A43B5/04, A63C10/00, A63C9/00, A63C5/04, A63C5/02 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A63C13/005 (EP,US);
A63C13/003 (EP,US);
A63C13/006 (EP,US);
A63C5/003 (US);
A63C5/0428 (EP,US);
A63C5/044 (US);
A63C13/001 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | A63C13/00, A43B5/04, A63C10/00, A63C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | HYBRIDER SCHNEESCHUH-SKI | [2018/44] | English: | HYBRID SNOWSHOE-SKI | [2018/44] | French: | HYBRIDE RAQUETTE-SKI | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 29.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/36] | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5735063 (MC MANUS JOHN H [US]) [X] 1,13 * column 4, line 39 - column 6, line 6; figures 1,2,3,5,6,7,8 * [A] 2-12,14,15; | [XA]US3344538 (WILLIAM MASSICOTTE) [X] 1,14 * column 3, line 13 - column 3, line 22; figures 14,16,17 * [A] 2-12,15; | [A]US3269037 (WILLIAM MASSICOTTE) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 8; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2009265957 (LAUG TAMARA LYNN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1C *; | [A]US2008172908 (TATSUNO ISAMU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] , [0047]; figure 10 *; | [A]CA2617453 (FABER & CO INC [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 25; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5996259 (GALLAY PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 *Figures 9, 10e; Column 3, lines 1-15, Column 4, lines 10-18*; | [A]CA2617453 (FABER & CO INC [CA]) [A] 1 *Abstract; Figure 1 *; | [A]US8925956 (HARKIN JAMES B [US]) [A] 1 *Column 2, lines 36-56*; | [A]US5809668 (KINIRY DANIEL P [US], et al) [A] 1 *Column 6, lines 6-12*; | [A]US3861698 (GREIG JAMES W) [A] 1 *Column 2, lines 36-46* |