EP3397252 - PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, Jesse 72 Summer Road Flemington New Jersey 08822 / US | 02 /
KOZUBAL, Cheryl 8 Angel Place Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US | 03 /
HOLERCA, Nick 90 Rodney Avenue Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15912201.9 | 31.12.2015 | [2018/45] | WO2015US68233 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017116458 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397252 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3397252 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/095 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
A61K8/20 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A61K8/442 (BR,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A61K8/368 (BR,US);
A61K8/40 (RU);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,BR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,BR,US);
A61Q5/00 (RU);
A61Q5/02 (EP,BR,US);
A61K2800/48 (EP,BR,US);
A61K2800/596 (EP,BR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2018/45] | English: | PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS | [2018/45] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS PERSONNELS | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 19.08.2019 | Observations by third parties | 28.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Observations by third parties | 23.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2022
12.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
31.08.2022
05.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | 03
01.09.2022
06.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE Unilever IP Holdings B.V./ Unilever Global IP Limited Weena 455/Port Sunlight 3013 AL Rotterdam/Wirral Merseyside CH62 4ZD / NL Opponent's representative Chisem, Janet Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2022
12.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
31.08.2022
05.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Beiersdorf AG Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
01.09.2022
06.09.2022
ADMISSIBLE Unilever IP Holdings B.V./ Unilever Global IP Limited Weena 455/Port Sunlight 3013 AL Rotterdam/Wirral Merseyside CH62 4ZD / NL Opponent's representative Chisem, Janet Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | |||
Former [2022/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2022
12.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
31.08.2022
Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Beiersdorf AG Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2022/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2022
12.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2022/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2022
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 13.09.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.03.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2015 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | TR | 01.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | IE | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | LU | 31.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 31.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1932512 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,15 * page 2, paragraph 1 *; | [X]DE102011078111 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-7,15 * page 2, paragraph 2 ** example 3 *; | [X]WO2013098066 (EVONIK INDUSTRIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-9,15 * page 27; table 28 * * page 24; table 20 * * page 31; table 39 * * page 1, lines 1-20 *; | [X]EP2881381 (EVONIK INDUSTRIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7-12,15 * tables 9,11 * | International search | [A]US2003064091 (KINDERDINE SHERRIE L [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2006079415 (KOZUBAL CHERYL [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 16-18* entire document *; | [X]US2014121268 (GUSKEY GERALD JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document *; | [A]US9187716 (GRIFFIN JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document * | Examination | US2004105894 | EP2066285 | other | EP2066285 | Opposition | DE19950019 | WO03051319 | DE102009026775 | EP2559749 | DE102012220148 | WO2014070689 | WO2014090651 | WO2016146361 | WO2010003860 | US2012128618 | CN104306222 | WO2015052021 | WO03078558 | EP1674132 | WO2007006402 | WO2008017653 | - Anonymous, "Neroliol ", FEY OTTE Wörterbuch der Kosmetik, (19970101), pages 194 - 195, XP055953352 | - "Iced Pineapple Shower Gel", GNPD, MINTEL, (201507), Database accession no. 3276963, XP055953355 | - Anonymous, "Hair care products - Men's styling gel (GAF) Hair Dressing Cream", Cosmetics & Toiletries, (19851100), vol. 100, page 81, XP055959647 | - Weber Klaus, "New alternatives to paraben-based preservative blends", Cosmetics & Toiletries magazine, (20050100), vol. 120, no. 1, pages 57 - 62, XP055909102 | - Anonymous, "Safety data sheet for "Lexaine C"", Inolex, (20150316), pages 1 - 6, XP055959656 | - U. KORTEMEIER et al., "Thickening Agents for Surfactant Systems", SOFW Journal, (20100000), vol. 136, pages 30 - 38, XP055507361 | - Anonymous, "Product Data Sheet TEXAPON® N 70", Care chemicals, (20060610), pages 1 - 3, XP055963777 | - Anonymous, "Data Profile DEHYTON® PK 45", Henkel KGgA, (19970102), pages 1 - 5, XP055963779 | - "Kapitel 7 - Kosmetische Mittel zur Reinigung, Pflege und zum Schutz der Haut", Umbach Wilfried, Kosmetik und Hygiene von Kopf bis Fuss, 3. Auflage, Weinheim, Wiley VCH Verlag GmbH, (20040101), pages 126 - 127, XP055963735 | - Fiume Monice M, Et Al.,, "Safety Assessment of PEGylated Alkyl Glycerides as Used in Cosmetics", International Journal of Toxicology, (20200101), vol. 39, no. Suppl.2, pages 28S - 29S, XP055963744 | - Anonymous, "REWOPOL® SB FA 30 B", Evonik Industries AG, (20080401), pages 1 - 3, XP055963755 | - Anonymous, "REWOPOL® SB FA 30 B Product Specification", Evonik Industries AG, (20031103), page 1, XP055963761 | - Anonymous, "Tego® Betain F 50 Concentrated Cocamidopropyl Betaine", Evonik Industries AG, (20080401), pages 1 - 4, XP055963765 | - "Croda", B. Ziolkowsky, Kosmetikjahrbuch 1998, Bad Schussenried, VeBu Druck GmbH , (19980101), pages 2, 72 - 73, XP055963770 | - "Surfactants Europa, Third Edition /Passage/", Gordon L. Hollis, Surfactants Europa, Third Edition, The Royal Society of Chemistry , (19950101), page 2pp, 2, 47, XP055963773 |