EP3205399 - METHOD FOR GRAFTING POLYSILOXANES ON SURFACES OF PHOTOCATALYTIC METAL OXIDES, POLYSILOXANE-GRAFTED METAL OXIDE SURFACES AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOH, Dr. Sangyuk Hechtsheimer Str. 37a Room 238 55131 Mainz / DE | 02 /
BUTT, Prof. Dr. Hans-Jürgen Bergstrasse 13 57223 Kreuztal / DE | 03 /
VOLLMER, Dr. Doris Hafenstrasse 4 55118 Mainz / DE | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/33] | 01 /
WOOH, Dr. Shangyuk Hechtsheimer Str. 37a Room 238 55131 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
BUTT, Prof. Dr. Hans-Jürgen Bergstrasse 13 57223 Kreuztal / DE | |||
03 /
VOLLMER, Dr. Doris Hafenstrasse 4 55118 Mainz / DE | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16000330.7 | 10.02.2016 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205399 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/00, B01J37/02, C09D183/04 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
C03C17/42 (EP);
B01J35/39 (EP);
B01J37/0209 (EP);
B01J37/0219 (EP);
B01J37/344 (EP);
B01J37/345 (EP);
C03C17/009 (EP);
C09D183/04 (EP);
C03C2217/445 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PFROPFUNG VON POLYSILOXANEN AUF OBERFLÄCHEN VON PHOTOKATALYTISCHEN METALLOXIDEN, POLYSILOXANGEPFROPFTE METALLOXIDOBERFLÄCHEN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/33] | English: | METHOD FOR GRAFTING POLYSILOXANES ON SURFACES OF PHOTOCATALYTIC METAL OXIDES, POLYSILOXANE-GRAFTED METAL OXIDE SURFACES AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2017/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GREFFAGE DE POLYSILOXANES SUR DES SURFACES D'OXYDES MÉTALLIQUES PHOTOCATALYTIQUES, SURFACES D'OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE GREFFÉ DE POLYSILOXANE ET LEURS APPLICATIONS | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 04.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1106653 (DOW CORNING ASIA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0018] - [0025] - [0035] , [0038]; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1712531 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0079] - [0086]; figure -; examples 13,14 *; | [X]EP2128214 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0024] - [0029]; example -; claim - *; | [X] - SWAGATA BANERJEE ET AL, "Self-cleaning applications of TiO2 by photo-induced hydrophilicity and photocatalysis", APPLIED CATALYSIS B: ENVIRONMENTAL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150402), vol. 176-177, doi:10.1016/j.apcatb.2015.03.058, ISSN 0926-3373, pages 396 - 428, XP055293956 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [002.] , [003.] , [006.]; figures 1,5,7,8; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcatb.2015.03.058 | [X] - ZHANG XIA ET AL, "Self-cleaning superhydrophobic surface based on titanium dioxide nanowires combined with polydimethylsiloxane", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (20130727), vol. 284, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2013.07.100, ISSN 0169-4332, pages 319 - 323, XP028710374 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2013.07.100 | [X] - COLIN R. CRICK ET AL, "Superhydrophobic Photocatalytic Surfaces through Direct Incorporation of Titania Nanoparticles into a Polymer Matrix by Aerosol Assisted Chemical Vapor Deposition", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20120710), vol. 24, no. 26, doi:10.1002/adma.201201239, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 3505 - 3508, XP055166875 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201201239 | [X] - NOBUHITO IGUCHI ET AL., "Characterization of Siloxane Adsorbates Covalently Attached to TiO2", SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA, (20081231), vol. 7034, XP040441272 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [2.1.1]; figures 1,2 * | [X] - KUJAWA JOANNA ET AL, "Efficiency of grafting of Al2O3, TiO2 and ZrO2 powders by perfluoroalkylsilanes", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. A, PHYSICACHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20121226), vol. 420, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFA.2012.12.021, ISSN 0927-7757, pages 64 - 73, XP028977655 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [2.3.1]; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfa.2012.12.021 | by applicant | US5616532 | US2010326699 | - S. M. KHALED ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2007), vol. 23, pages 3988 - 3995 | - T. KAMEGAWA ET AL., ADV. MATER, (2012), vol. 24, pages 3697 - 3700 | - N. YOSHIDA ET AL., THIN SOLID FILMS, (2006), vol. 502, pages 108 - 111 | - K. IKETANI ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. SOL., (2003), vol. 64, page 507 | - M.T.S. TAVARES ET AL., SURF. COAT. TECH., (2014), vol. 239, pages 16 - 19 | - G. GRAFFIUS ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2014), vol. 30, pages 14797 - 14807 | - J. W. KRUMPFER ET AL., FARADAY DISCUSS., (2010), vol. 146, pages 103 - 111 | - W. KRUMPFER ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2011), vol. 27, pages 11514 - 11519 |