EP3109387 - DRIVE TRACK AND A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING TWO DRIVE TRACK SECTIONS WITH EACH OTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novoferm Tormatic GmbH Eisenhüttenweg 6 DE-44145 Dortmund / DE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glanz, Michael Franziskaweg 2 D 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Sojka, Ralf Ludwig-Feuerbach-Weg 20 D 58239 Schwerte / DE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 16001301.7 | 09.06.2016 | [2016/52] | Priority number, date | DE20151007954 | 23.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015007954 | DE20151010466 | 15.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015010466 | DE20151012419 | 25.09.2015 Original published format: DE102015012419 | DE20161002919 | 11.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016002919 | [2016/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109387 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/16, E05F15/668 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
E05D15/165 (EP);
E05F15/668 (EP);
E05Y2201/684 (EP);
E05Y2600/626 (EP);
E05Y2800/41 (EP);
E05Y2900/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSCHIENE UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE VON ZWEI ANTRIEBSCHIENENABSCHNITTEN UNTEREINANDER | [2016/52] | English: | DRIVE TRACK AND A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING TWO DRIVE TRACK SECTIONS WITH EACH OTHER | [2016/52] | French: | RAILS D'ENTRAINEMENT ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE DE DEUX SECTIONS DE RAIL D'ENTRAINEMENT | [2016/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP0859111 (PRETTL ROLF [DE]) [X] 1,5,14-16 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 39 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 8,10-12,17 [Y] 3,4,6,9 [I] 2,13; | [X]US4018005 (HARRIS DONALD S) [X] 1,5,7 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 36 * * column 4, line 12 - line 24 * * figures 1,2,4,7 *; | [Y]DE29919191U (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,9 * page 5, line 16 - line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2008071401 (FAAC SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 6 * page 3, line 9 - line 12 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE202011107685U | DE4118782 | DE9112357U | EP1398448 | DE8536639U | DE9319898U | DE202005016816U | DE202005019968U | DE29810158U | DE102007062466 |