Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015007954 | 07.06.2023 | B4 | DE102015007954 | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015007954 | 23.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015010466 | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015010466 | 15.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015012419 | 15.09.2016 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102015012419 | 25.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016002919 | 14.12.2017 | B4 | DE102016002919 | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016002919 | 11.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3109387 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015010466 | 15.08.2015 | DE102015012419 | 25.09.2015 | DE102015007954 | 23.06.2015 | DE102016002919 | 11.03.2016 |