08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
05.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
31.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
27.07.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
18.07.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
23.02.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
05.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
05.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
07.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
07.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
13.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|