EP3124928 - HOLDING DEVICE AND USE OF AN ENCODING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Testo Sensor GmbH Testo-Strasse 1 79853 Lenzkirch / DE | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binder, Jörg Am Gütle 4 79877 Friedenweiler / DE | 02 /
Bailer, Mathias Ibenbachstr. 3 79256 Buchenbach / DE | [2017/21] |
Former [2017/12] | 01 /
Binder, Jörg Am Gütle 4 79877 Friedenweiler / DE | ||
02 /
Bailer, Mathais Ibenbachstr. 3 79256 Buchenbach / DE | |||
Former [2017/05] | 01 /
Binder, Jörg Am Gütle 4 79877 Fiedenweiler / DE | ||
02 /
Bailer, Mathais Ibenbachstr. 3 79256 Buchenbach / DE | Representative(s) | Börjes-Pestalozza, Henrich, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 16001677.0 | 29.07.2016 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | DE20151009618 | 29.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015009618 | [2017/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3124928 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3124928 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/14 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
G01K1/143 (EP);
G01K13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINES KODIERELEMENTS | [2017/05] | English: | HOLDING DEVICE AND USE OF AN ENCODING ELEMENT | [2017/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE ET UTILISATION D'UN ELEMENT DE CODAGE | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2000787 (EPCOS AG [DE]) [X] 8-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0007] , [0010] , [0011] , [0015] , [0023] , [0025] , [0027]; figures 1,2a * [A] 12,16 [I] 1-7,11,13-15,17,18,20; | [A]US2014161151 (PROCTOR JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0038] , [0040]; figure 4 *; | [A]DE9210726U (HUAN, CHUN-MU, SAN-CHUNG, TAIPEH, TW) [A] 1-20 * page 3, lines 10-34; figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE7705860U (EGLI, FISCHER & CO AG ZÜRICH) [A] 1-7,17,18 * page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * * page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [A]GB624335 (FOSTER INSTR COMPANY LTD, et al) [A] 12,14-16,19,20 * page 1, lines 33-42; figures 6,7 * * page 1, line 80 - page 2, line 21 * * page 3, line 83 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, lines 72-106 * * page 5, lines 35-45 *; | [A]DE20216024U (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |