Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3156407 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3156407



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 159
21.03.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.11.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
15.11.2017 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
10.11.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.03.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.03.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.03.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.03.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
17.03.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
17.03.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
08.12.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
08.12.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
05.08.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.08.2016 Description Search / examination 58
05.08.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.08.2016 Drawings Search / examination 6
05.08.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.08.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
09.02.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 56