EP3290555 - NEEDLE FOR FORMING STITCHES ON A WEFT OR WARP KNITTING MACHINE, WEFT OR WARP KNITTING MACHINE WITH A PLURALITY OF SUCH NEEDLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofmann, Ulrich Postfach 151 72422 Albstadt / DE | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16001924.6 | 02.09.2016 | [2018/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290555 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D04B35/06 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
D04B35/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NADEL ZUR MASCHENBILDUNG AN EINER STRICK- ODER KETTENWIRKMASCHINE, STRICK- ODER KETTENWIRKMASCHINE MIT MEHREREN SOLCHER NADELN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN NADEL | [2018/10] | English: | NEEDLE FOR FORMING STITCHES ON A WEFT OR WARP KNITTING MACHINE, WEFT OR WARP KNITTING MACHINE WITH A PLURALITY OF SUCH NEEDLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A NEEDLE | [2018/10] | French: | AIGUILLE POUR MACHINE À TRICOTER OU MACHINE À TRICOTER À CHAÎNE, MACHINE À TRICOTER OU MACHINE À TRICOTER À CHAÎNE COMPRENANT PLUSIEURES DESDITES AIGUILLES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DESDITES AIGUILLES | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 08.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAI]DE102007039973 (HOFMANN ULRICH [DE]) [XD] 1-3,5-9,11-14,17 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0012] , [ 0013] , [ 0063] , [ 0065] , [ 0070] , [ 0077] - [0079]; figures 1 ,3, 9-15, 16 * [A] 10,15,18 [I] 16; | [XDAI]DE2241769 (WILDT MELLOR BROMLEY LTD) [XD] 1-3,5-7,9,11,12,17 * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 18; figures 1-8, 12 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 74 * * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 13 * [A] 4,8,10,13-15,18 [I] 16; | [XDAI]DE2245731 (MAYER & CIE MASCHINENFABRIK) [XD] 1-3,7,9,11,17 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 3; figures 1-2 * * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 1 * [A] 4-6,8,10,12-15,18 [I] 16; | [XI]DE10335464 (GROZ BECKERT KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,12,17 * paragraphs [0043] , [ 0045] , [ 0050] , [ 0074] , [ 0075] , [ 0078]; figures 1-4, 6, 25-30 * [I] 16; | [X]DE2100 (EUGÈNE DURAND) [X] 1,5-7,9,11,12,17 * figures 1-8 *; | [XI]DE102013105239 (GROZ BECKERT KG [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,11,17 * paragraphs [0048] , [ 0052]; figure 1 * [I] 16; | [XI]JP2942795B (ORGAN NEEDLE) [X] 1,8,11,17 * figures 1, 5, 10, 11 * [I] 16; | [A]DE19820042 (TERROT STRICKMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 16 * column 1, lines 28-34 * * column 2, lines 45-65 * * column 7, lines 31-37 * | by applicant | DE102007039973 | DE2241769 | DE2245731 |