EP3267667 - MOBILE TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Namki IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Insuk IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 03 /
OH, Sesook IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 04 /
SEO, Kyunghye IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Choi, Jian IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 06 /
Kang, Shinnyue IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 07 /
Jeon, Bongjeong IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 08 /
Yang, Yoonseok IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16002269.5 | 24.10.2016 | [2018/02] | Priority number, date | KR20160085356 | 06.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160085356 | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3267667 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3267667 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, // G06F3/14, G06F3/16, H04N5/225, G06F3/0482 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H04M1/72415 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/1423 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/1454 (US);
G06F3/165 (US);
H04M1/724092 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (US);
H04M2201/34 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/02] | H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2018/02] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2018/02] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2018/02] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005071530 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *; | [A]WO2013123597 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US2015065056 (WON SUNG-JOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] ** paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0114] * |