EP3151000 - LIQUID ELECTROLYTE FOR AN ELECTROCHEMICAL GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dräger Safety AG & Co. KGaA Revalstrasse 1 23560 Lübeck / DE | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAUBER, Andreas Johannes Grevsen-Strasse 1 23617 Stockelsdorf / DE | 02 /
SICK, Michael Birkenallee 14 23669 Timmendorfer Strand / DE | 03 /
STEINER, Gregor Josef-Sorg-Straße 36 79822 Titisee-Neustadt / DE | 04 /
MATTERN-FRÜHWALD, Marie-Isabell Tremsbütteler Weg 88b 22941 Bargteheide / DE | 05 /
CHRZAN, Rigobert Ölmühle 10 23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | 06 /
SOMMER, Sabrina Ginsterweg 12 23558 Lübeck / DE | 07 /
METT, Frank Schönböckener Strasse 3a 23556 Lübeck / DE | 08 /
HENGSTENBERG, Andreas Im Tannengrund 117 23858 Reinfeld / DE | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Guthöhrlein, Gerhard Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA Moislinger Allee 53 - 55 23558 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Kettenbeil, Roxane Henriette Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA Moislinger Allee 53/55 23558 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 16002306.5 | 01.09.2014 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | DE20131014995 | 09.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013014995 | [2017/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3151000 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3151000 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/404, G01N33/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G01N27/4045 (EP,US);
G01N33/0054 (EP,US);
G01N27/404 (RU);
Y02A50/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2017/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGER ELEKTROLYT FÜR EINEN ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN GASSENSOR | [2017/14] | English: | LIQUID ELECTROLYTE FOR AN ELECTROCHEMICAL GAS SENSOR | [2017/14] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE LIQUIDE POUR UN CAPTEUR DE GAZ ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14758300.9 / EP3044575 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2014 | AL | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | MT | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | TR | 14.07.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | IE | 01.09.2021 | LU | 01.09.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.09.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
TR | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.09.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 01.09.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 01.09.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 14.07.2021 | |
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 14.07.2021 | |
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 14.07.2021 | |
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB2225859 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * page 2, line 27 - page 6, line 20 * * figure - * [Y] 2,3,8-10 [I] 13-15; | [YA]EP2224018 (QIAGEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * [A] 1,15; | [A]WO2013045561 (UNIV MUENSTER WILHELMS [DE], et al) [A] 1,3-8,12,15 * page 11, line 10 - page 16, line 3 * * claims 1-5 *; | [YA] - XIAOBO JI ET AL, "Determination of ammonia based on the electrochemical oxidation of N,N'-diphenylenediamine in propylene carbonate", ANALYTICAL SCIENCES, (200711), vol. 23, pages 1317 - 1320, XP055154055 [Y] 8-10 * the whole document * [A] 1,4,6,11-15 | [A] - LOPEZ DE MISHIMA B A ET AL, "Ammonia sensor based on propylene carbonate", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL, (20080414), vol. 131, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.SNB.2007.11.012, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 236 - 240, XP022602889 [A] 1,4-6,8,12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2007.11.012 | [A] - GIOVANELLI D ET AL, "Determination of ammonia based on the electro-oxidation of hydroquinone in dimethylformamide or in the room temperature ionic liquid, 1-ethyl-3-methylimidazolium bis(trifluoromethylsulfonyl)imide", TALANTA, (200404), vol. 62, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.talanta.2003.10.015, ISSN 0039-9140, pages 904 - 911, XP055153888 [A] 1,6,8-10,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2003.10.015 | Examination | - Anon, "Good's buffers", (20170101), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/api/rest_v1/page/pdf/Good's_buffers, (20171109), XP055423303 | by applicant | EP0395927 | EP0556558 |