|
18.05.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2021 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2017 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |