EP3170627 - TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Michio c/o MAX CO., LTD., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8502 / JP | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 16002438.6 | 17.11.2016 | [2017/21] | Priority number, date | JP20150228225 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015228225 | JP20150228226 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015228226 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3170627 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3170627 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3170627 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US);
B25F5/00 (EP,CN,US);
B25F5/001 (CN,US);
B25B21/02 (CN,US);
G01L1/22 (CN,US);
H01H13/08 (EP,US);
H01H13/14 (EP,US);
H01H9/04 (CN);
H01H9/06 (CN);
H01H9/061 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/29] | B25F5/02, H01H9/06, B25F5/00, H01H1/029 | ||
Former IPC [2017/21] | B25F5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2017/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKZEUG | [2017/21] | English: | TOOL | [2017/21] | French: | OUTIL | [2017/21] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 22.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2016 | AL | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | MT | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | TR | 30.09.2020 | IE | 17.11.2020 | LU | 17.11.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.11.2016 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MT | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
TR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.11.2020 | ||
LU | 17.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.11.2020 | ||
LU | 17.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.11.2020 | ||
LU | 17.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.11.2020 | ||
LU | 17.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.11.2020 | ||
LU | 17.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012068633 (WATANABE MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US8523845 (IPPISCH ANDREAS [DE]); | [AD]US2013255981 (NOTO KEIKO [JP], et al); | [AD]JP2013202702 (HITACHI KOKI KK) | Examination | US2014252881 | by applicant | JP3050919U | JP2013202702 | JP2014167926 |