Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
10.02.2021 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
20.11.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.11.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.07.2019 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
22.03.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.03.2019 | First examination report | |
03.12.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.12.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
01.12.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
01.12.2017 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
19.05.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |