EP3173055 - BUS, ESPECIALLY A TRAVEL BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landsherr, Thomas Trollblumenstraße 41 80995 München / DE | 02 /
Obermeier, Hellen Francèstr. 3 80997 München / DE | 03 /
Wagner, Jürgen Fellacher Str. 2 83626 Valley / DE | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Liebl, Thomas Neubauer - Liebl - Bierschneider - Massinger Münchener Straße 49 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [2023/02] |
Former [2017/22] | Liebl, Thomas Neubauer - Liebl - Bierschneider Patentanwälte Münchener Straße 49 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 16002514.4 | 25.11.2016 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | DE20151015387 | 28.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015015387 | [2017/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173055 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3173055 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61G3/06, // B60P1/44 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A61G3/066 (EP);
A61G2220/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BUS, INSBESONDERE REISEBUS | [2017/22] | English: | BUS, ESPECIALLY A TRAVEL BUS | [2017/22] | French: | BUS, EN PARTICULIER AUTOCAR | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | ES | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3918596 (WARD DAVID HENRY) [X] 1,13,14 * column 1, line 53 - column 3, line 25 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0121348 (ALPHA LIFTS LTD [GB]) [A] 6-9 * page 4 - page 15 ** figures 1-5 *; | [X]GB2140749 (DIESEL EQUIP) [X] 1,13,14 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 67 * * figures 1-5 *; | [XY]US4804308 (HAMBLIN PETER [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,10-14 * column 5, line 13 - column 11, line 39 * * column 14, line 5 - line 18 * * figures 1-5, 12 * [Y] 6-9; | [XY]WO2005123450 (GLIDE RITE PRODUCTS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * page 5, line 15 - page 20, line 14 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 6-9 | Examination | EP2103498 | by applicant | DE102012007666 |