EP3333556 - TEMPERATURE SENSOR, USE OF THE TEMPERATURE SENSOR AND COMBUSTION ENGINE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kellermann, Christian Am Billehang 5 22946 Grande / DE | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16002615.9 | 08.12.2016 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333556 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/00, G01J5/08, G01J5/06, G01J5/52 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
G01J5/0014 (EP);
G01J5/04 (EP);
G01J5/041 (EP);
G01J5/0831 (EP);
G01J5/0887 (EP);
G01J5/53 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSENSOR, VERWENDUNG DES TEMPERATURSENSORS UND BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN | [2018/24] | English: | TEMPERATURE SENSOR, USE OF THE TEMPERATURE SENSOR AND COMBUSTION ENGINE THEREWITH | [2018/24] | French: | CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE, UTILISATION DU CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE ET MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE AVEC CE CAPTEUR | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 05.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2027697 (DINTER K) [Y] 5,6* page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US3626758 (STEWART JAMES E, et al) [X] 1-4,7-12 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6 |