EP3086045 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR AIR TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoppellaro S.r.l. Via galileo Galilei 9 35020 Codevigo (PD) / IT | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zoppellaro, Giuseppe C/O Zoppellaro S.R.L. VIA Galileo Galilei 9 35020 Codevigo PD / IT | 02 /
Zoppellaro, Francesco C/O Zoppellaro S.R.L. VIA Galileo Galilei 9 35020 Codevigo PD / IT | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Baldissera, Marco Felice Arkonsult - Div. Baldissera Brevetti Via Serio, 3 35135 Padova PD / IT | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 16020142.2 | 16.04.2016 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | IT2015PD00087 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: IT PD20150087 | [2016/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086045 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
F25B47/025 (EP);
F24F1/0284 (EP,US);
F24F1/0323 (EP,US);
F24F11/41 (EP);
F24F2012/008 (EP);
F25B13/00 (EP);
Y02B30/56 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LUFT | [2016/43] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR AIR TREATMENT | [2016/43] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'AIR | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2481348 (RINGQUIST CLARENCE L, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 38; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 16 - column 5, line 50 *; | [A]FR2099991 (RINIPA AB) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 4 - page 5, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US6021644 (ARES ROLAND [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * column 5, line 7 - column 7, line 60; figures 3a,3b * [I] 2-5,10; | [A]US6131653 (LARSSON DONALD E [US]) [A] 1,6* column 2, line 11 - column 2, line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]US6442951 (MAEDA KENSAKU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 36, line 46 - column 38, line 52; figures 18-20 *; | [XA]WO2008015981 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,2,6-9 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0083] * [A] 2-5,7-10; | [XI]US2015082817 (STARK WALTER [US]) [X] 1,6-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1B,2,4,5B,11-16 * [I] 2-5,10 |