EP3035422 - BATTERY GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | [2017/34] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 912 E 32nd Street Holland, MI 49423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kao, Wen-Hong 5356 West Silverleaf Brown Deer, WI 53223 / US | 02 /
Andersen, Glenn W. 864 Harding Drive Hartford, WI 54027 / US | 03 /
Taylor, Eric M. 1313 N. Franklin Place No. 1504 Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | 04 /
Adams, Kenneth W166 N10280 Calico Lane Germantown, WI 53022 / US | 05 /
Mrotek, Edward N. 2076 Chateau Court Apt. 212 Grafton, WI 53024 / US | 06 /
Zagrodnik, Jeffrey P. 6260 Whitnall Way Hales Corners, WI 53130 / US | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/25] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16150021.0 | 22.05.2006 | [2016/25] | Priority number, date | US20050683608P | 23.05.2005 Original published format: US 683608 P | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3035422 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3035422 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/74 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
H01M4/73 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/70 (KR);
H01M4/742 (EP,US);
H01M4/745 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/25] | Title | German: | BATTERIEGITTER | [2016/25] | English: | BATTERY GRID | [2016/25] | French: | GRILLE POUR BATTERIE | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06770804.0 / EP1900048 | EP10012006.2 / EP2287948 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2006 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | IE | 22.05.2019 | LU | 22.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3989539 (GRABB NICHOLAS G) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5601953 (SCHENK RAYMOND L [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3, 4 *; | [A]WO0104977 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002015891 (SCHAEFFER CHARLES J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1 * | Examination | US5169659 | JP2000243402 | by applicant | US5582936 | US5989749 | US6203948 | US6245462 | US6274274 |