Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9807311 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2017 | B2 | US2016198077 | 07.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015000799 | 06.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6459517B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2019 | B2 | JP2016127478 | 11.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015000799 | 06.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3043547 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2021 | B1 | EP3043547 | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015000799 | 06.01.2015 |