EP3057185 - QUANTUM PHOTONIC IMAGERS AND METHODS OF FABRICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ostendo Technologies, Inc. 6185 Paseo del Norte, Suite 200 Carlsbad, California 92011 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL-GHOROURY, Hussein, S. 7275 Spoonbill Lane Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Robert, G.W. 14421 Poplar Drive Tustin, CA 92780 / US | 03 /
MCNEILL, Dale, A. 506 Village Center Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 04 /
DENBOER, Huibert 442 Skyridge Lane Escondido, CA 92026 / US | 05 /
LANZONE, Andrew, J. 265 Trilogy Street San Marcos, CA 92078 / US | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 2 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16150217.4 | 16.09.2008 | [2016/33] | Priority number, date | US20070975772P | 27.09.2007 Original published format: US 975772 P | US20070964642 | 26.12.2007 Original published format: US 964642 | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3057185 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/42, H01S5/022, // H01S5/18, H01S5/10 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
H01S5/4043 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/11 (CN,KR);
B82Y20/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/02345 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/183 (KR);
H01S5/2009 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/3063 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/34326 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/34333 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/4093 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0235 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2340/06 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | QUANTENPHOTONISCHE BILDGEBER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/33] | English: | QUANTUM PHOTONIC IMAGERS AND METHODS OF FABRICATION THEREOF | [2016/33] | French: | IMAGEURS PHOTONIQUES QUANTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CEUX-CI | [2016/33] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08799572.6 / EP2208267 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2018 | 30.09.2018 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2019 | 30.09.2019 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9318428 (KOPIN CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 7, lines 27-29 * * page 8, lines 7,8 * * page 37, line 24 - page 38, line 12 * * page 39, lines 14-27 * * page 45, lines 10-26 * * figures 19,24 * [I] 2-9; | [I]WO03003423 (XANOPTIX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 37, lines 15-27 * * figure 34 *; | [A]JP2003273456 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [I]US2004241892 (COLGAN EVAN G [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] * * figures 1a, 1b *; | [A]EP1587186 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0037] , [0040] , [0070] * * figures 1,7A,7B,8 * | by applicant | US4744088 | US4794609 | US4799229 | US4817104 | US4947401 | US4976539 | US5323411 | US5386428 | US5583351 | US5708674 | US5715264 | US5809052 | US5920766 | US6144685 | US6205160 | US6233265 | US6633421 | US6668003 | US2004008392 | US6741625 | US6744800 | US6853490 | US6869185 | US6934309 | US6939012 | US6975366 | US2006023173 | US7092424 | US7120182 | US7122843 | US2006268241 | US7177335 | - J. W. GOODMAN, Introduction to Fourier Optics, MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 172 - 214 | - JANSEN ET AL., "Visible Laser and Laser Array Sources for Projection Displays", PROC. OF SPIE, (2006), vol. 6135 | - POYNTON, CHARLES, Digital Video and HDTV: Algorithms and Interfaces, (2003), pages 252 - 253 | - "Chapter 2,", A. THELEN, Design of Optical Interface Coatings, MCGRAW-HILL, pages 5 - 24 | - "chapter 8", M. BORN ET AL., Principles of Optics, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, pages 439 - 443 |