EP3046305 - AUTOMATED DISTRIBUTION OF LOGON CREDENTIALS FOR ESTABLISHING WIRELESS CONNECTIVITY OF ELECTRONIC FLIGHT BAG(EFB) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENZL, Martin HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
GOTTHARD, Petr HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 16150505.2 | 07.01.2016 | [2016/29] | Priority number, date | US201514599198 | 16.01.2015 Original published format: US201514599198 | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046305 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3046305 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, H04W12/04, H04W12/06, H04W84/06, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W4/00 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,CN,US);
H04W12/02 (CN);
H04B5/70 (EP,US);
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/105 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (US);
H04W12/35 (EP,US);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/29] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VERTEILUNG VON ANMELDUNGSBERECHTIGUNGSNACHWEISEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DRAHTLOSER KONNEKTIVITÄT EINES ELECTRONIC FLIGHT BAG (EFB) | [2016/29] | English: | AUTOMATED DISTRIBUTION OF LOGON CREDENTIALS FOR ESTABLISHING WIRELESS CONNECTIVITY OF ELECTRONIC FLIGHT BAG(EFB) | [2016/29] | French: | DISTRIBUTION AUTOMATISÉE DES JUSTIFICATIFS D'IDENTITÉ D'OUVERTURE DE SESSION PERMETTANT D'ÉTABLIR UNE CONNECTIVITÉ SANS FIL D'ORGANISEUR ÉLECTRONIQUE DE POSTE DE PILOTAGE | [2016/29] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 26.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2016 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | IE | 07.01.2018 | LU | 07.01.2018 | MT | 07.01.2018 | SI | 07.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/34] | HU | 07.01.2016 | |
AL | 07.06.2017 | ||
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.01.2016 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.01.2016 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006251256 (ASOKAN NADARAJAH [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008086637 (ROYALTY CHARLES D [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * claim 8 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US8495722 (MCCUSKER PATRICK D [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014059351 (BRASKICH ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [AP]US2015327307 (RANDRIANASOLO NDRIANINA [FR], et al) [AP] 1-10 * the whole document * |