EP3043120 - VENTILATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWAK, Taehee LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
HA, Doyong LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
RYU, Myongsok LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Jaeheuk LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 16150759.5 | 11.01.2016 | [2016/28] | Priority number, date | KR20150004411 | 12.01.2015 Original published format: KR 20150004411 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043120 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F12/00, F24F1/02, F24F3/14 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
F24F1/022 (EP,KR,US);
F24F7/08 (CN);
F24F13/30 (CN,KR,US);
F24F12/003 (EP,KR,US);
F24F12/006 (CN);
F24F3/1429 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILATOR | [2016/28] | English: | VENTILATION APPARATUS | [2016/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE VENTILATION | [2016/28] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 13.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4678025 (OBERLANDER GEORGE H [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * column 2, line 11 - column 2, line 62 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6038879 (TURCOTTE YVON [CA], et al) [X] 1,13 * column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 40 * * figure - *; | [X]EP2244023 (AIR HABITAT [FR]) [X] 1,11,13 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0093] * * figure - *; | [Y]US2012180505 (GERBER MANFRED [CA], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086] ** figure - *; | [XY]EP2772697 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 16 |