|
16.06.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
13.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.09.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.09.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Invitation to file claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |