Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012168930 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2013 | A3 | WO2012168930 | 13.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012014076 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A3 | WO2012014076 | 02.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021317416 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US202117191650 | 03.03.2021 | US201313812614 | 08.04.2013 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | US201715665363 | 31.07.2017 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019100728 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113147163 | 14.09.2011 | US201314079545 | 13.11.2013 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | US201816113445 | 27.08.2018 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018072995 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201113147163 | 14.09.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201715654243 | 19.07.2017 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014243227 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201214124884 | 11.06.2012 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9765301 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2013189327 | 25.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201113812614 | 29.07.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9752124 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2017 | B2 | US2012196312 | 02.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8642339 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2014 | B2 | US2012028355 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201013147163 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11034935 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2021 | B2 | US2018066233 | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201313812614 | 08.04.2013 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | US201715665363 | 31.07.2017 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10947510 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2021 | B2 | US2014256037 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113147163 | 14.09.2011 | US201314079545 | 13.11.2013 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230037058 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20207028650 | 11.06.2012 | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200120956 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102245909B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2021 | B1 | KR20190087650 | 24.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102167396B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2020 | B1 | KR20140037210 | 26.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102034121B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2019 | B1 | KR20130138729 | 19.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101904224B | Global Dossier | 04.10.2018 | B1 | KR20120003855 | 11.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023099163 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | JP2021085361 | 20.05.2021 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7275196B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2023 | B2 | JP2021121214 | 26.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | JP2018000952 | 09.01.2018 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6889754B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2021 | B2 | JP2019176864 | 17.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | JP2017044694 | 09.03.2017 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018085999 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6535043B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | B2 | JP2017140033 | 17.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6275035B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2018 | B2 | JP2014516562 | 17.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6110299B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B2 | JP2013535201 | 12.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5458112B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | B2 | JP2012516685 | 26.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL290485 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL275204 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B | IL275204 | 30.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL267447 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | B | IL267447 | 29.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL229879 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL224409 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL214381 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4324913 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2024 | A3 | EP4324913 | 21.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | EP17189470 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | EP12729741 | 11.06.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4253529 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2024 | A3 | EP4253529 | 04.10.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP18182285 | 03.02.2010 | EP10703131 | 03.02.2010 | EP16151949 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3564361 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP11764293 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3441458 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2023 | B9 | EP3441458 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | C0 | EP3441458 | 07.06.2023 | B1 | EP3441458 | 13.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10703131 | 03.02.2010 | EP16151949 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3318627 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | C0 | EP3318627 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | B1 | EP3318627 | 09.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | EP12729741 | 11.06.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2718422 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B1 | EP2718422 | 16.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2598633 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | B1 | EP2598633 | 05.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP11764293 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2412800 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2393917 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2016 | B1 | EP2393917 | 14.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10703131 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109136163B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2024 | B | CN109136163 | 04.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | CN201280039061 | 11.06.2012 | CN201810714085 | 11.06.2012 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104024401B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2018 | B | CN104024401 | 03.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103237888B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B | CN103237888 | 07.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2838492 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | C | CA2838492 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2806760 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2020 | C | CA2806760 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2751332 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | C | CA2751332 | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023200027 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | AU2023200027 | 04.01.2023 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | AU2020200515 | 24.01.2020 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | AU2012265814 | 11.06.2012 | AU2017208270 | 26.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020200515B | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | B2 | AU2020200515 | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | AU2020200515 | 24.01.2020 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | AU2012265814 | 11.06.2012 | AU2017208270 | 26.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017208270B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2019 | B2 | AU2017208270 | 10.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | AU2012265814 | 11.06.2012 | AU2017208270 | 26.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017203722B | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | B2 | AU2017203722 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | AU2015213283 | 11.08.2015 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | AU2011284445 | 29.07.2011 | AU2017203722 | 02.06.2017 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015213283B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2017 | B2 | AU2015213283 | 03.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | AU2015213283 | 11.08.2015 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | AU2011284445 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012265814B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2017 | B2 | AU2012265814 | 16.01.2014 | A2 | AU2012265814 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011284445C | Global Dossier | 15.06.2017 | C1 | AU2011284445B | 21.05.2015 | B2 | AU2011284445 | 04.04.2013 | A2 | AU2011284445 | 14.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010211428B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2015 | B2 | AU2010211428 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3061808 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2020 | B1 | EP3061808 | 19.10.2016 | A3 | EP3061808 | 31.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP10703131 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013002249 | 24.05.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1008086 | 25.08.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP61149622 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3064220 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | CA2806760 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3220440 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | CA2838492 | 11.06.2012 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102439135B | 30.04.2014 | B | CN102439135 | 02.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2393917T | 18.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2598633T | 22.07.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2718422T | 27.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3061808T | 07.09.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10703131 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2579909T | 17.08.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2650980T | 23.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2735248T | 17.12.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2968078T | 07.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201111244D0 | 17.08.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1163746 | 14.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1255258 | 09.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20160791T | 23.09.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP10703131 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20171760T | 09.02.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | EP12729741 | 11.06.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20191087T | 20.09.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP11764293 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20201617T | 11.12.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP16151949 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20230650T | 29.09.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP18182285 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20231442T | 01.03.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP17189470 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE037174T | 28.08.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE044255T | 28.10.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE064631T | 28.04.2024 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011008044 | 12.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX353579 | 19.01.2018 | B | MX2013001045 | 03.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ594271 | 28.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ619314 | 29.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2598633T | 29.11.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP11764293 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2718422T | 30.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | EP12729741 | 11.06.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3061808T | 08.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10703131 | 03.02.2010 | EP16151949 | 03.02.2010 | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3318627T | 11.03.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2598633T | 10.07.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2718422T | 27.11.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3061808T | 20.10.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2555545 | 10.07.2015 | C2 | RU2011136704 | 10.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2579995 | 10.04.2016 | C2 | RU2013108820 | 10.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2714256 | 13.02.2020 | C2 | RU2013158140 | 20.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2012IB52950 | 11.06.2012 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2020105325 | 10.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201505887V | 29.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201607552X | 28.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201111244 | 30.06.2011 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | US201161513461 | 29.07.2011 | US201161571663 | 30.06.2011 | US201261594295 | 02.02.2012 | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10202111101T | 29.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG173492 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010NL00017 | 03.02.2010 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG187219 | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | WO2011IB02167 | 29.07.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201910320T | 21.08.2019 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US36873610 | 29.07.2010 | US201161520569 | 10.06.2011 | EP10171265 | 29.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010090513 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2010 | A3 | WO2010090513 | 12.08.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5722835B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2015 | B2 | JP2012254081 | 27.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2825713T | 17.05.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2948761T | 23.11.2023 | T9 | ES2948761T | 18.09.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE028647T | 28.12.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE050984T | 28.01.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE062459T | 28.11.2023 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019006565 | 22.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2393917T | 30.12.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3441458T | 06.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14962209 | 03.02.2009 | EP09171831 | 30.09.2009 | EP09151970 | 03.02.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP3441458 | EP4253529 | Type | Earlier application | EP2393917 |