Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017181154 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015112906 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014145965 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014145884 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A3 | WO2014145884 | 18.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023297549 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816000519 | 05.06.2018 | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201715488433 | 14.04.2017 | US202318201148 | 23.05.2023 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | US202016828471 | 24.03.2020 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201916541303 | 15.08.2019 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022138280 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916237735 | 01.01.2019 | US202217577541 | 18.01.2022 | US201916542252 | 15.08.2019 | US201615006108 | 25.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | US201816006601 | 12.06.2018 | US201715589922 | 08.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020159749 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US202016774288 | 28.01.2020 | US201816229954 | 21.12.2018 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514736262 | 10.06.2015 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9996502 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2018 | B2 | US2017242825 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | US201615006108 | 25.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201715589922 | 08.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9990380 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2018 | B2 | US2017220603 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201715488433 | 14.04.2017 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9646075 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2017 | B2 | US2016140211 | 19.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | US201615006108 | 25.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9471664 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | B2 | US2016098475 | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201514967328 | 13.12.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514736262 | 10.06.2015 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9910910 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2016098445 | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514736262 | 10.06.2015 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9245299 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2016 | B2 | US2015324919 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9361358 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2016 | B2 | US2015324450 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9098564 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2015134569 | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9098878 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2015134568 | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8990268 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2015 | B2 | US2014280246 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9069802 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2015 | B2 | US2014280161 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11657026 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2023 | B2 | US2020226105 | 16.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816000519 | 05.06.2018 | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201715488433 | 14.04.2017 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | US202016828471 | 24.03.2020 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201916541303 | 15.08.2019 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11227028 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2022 | B2 | US2019370308 | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201916237735 | 01.01.2019 | US201916542252 | 15.08.2019 | US201615006108 | 25.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201816006601 | 12.06.2018 | US201715589922 | 08.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11151096 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2021 | B2 | US2020379958 | 03.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816000519 | 05.06.2018 | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201715488433 | 14.04.2017 | US202016995787 | 17.08.2020 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201962887091 | 15.08.2019 | US202016828471 | 24.03.2020 | US201916541303 | 15.08.2019 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10599623 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2020 | B2 | US2019370231 | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816000519 | 05.06.2018 | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201715488433 | 14.04.2017 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201916541303 | 15.08.2019 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10545998 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2020 | B2 | US2019121818 | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201816229954 | 21.12.2018 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514736262 | 10.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10515123 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B2 | US2019228035 | 25.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201916237735 | 01.01.2019 | US201615006108 | 25.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201816006601 | 12.06.2018 | US201715589922 | 08.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10402379 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2019 | B2 | US2018285388 | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816000519 | 05.06.2018 | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201715488433 | 14.04.2017 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10204151 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | B2 | US2017169093 | 15.06.2017 | A9 | US2015310089 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514736262 | 10.06.2015 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10191888 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2018293207 | 11.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | US201615006108 | 25.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201816006601 | 12.06.2018 | US201715589922 | 08.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018196868 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2018 | A1 | US10019509 | 10.07.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | US201815912547 | 05.03.2018 | US201514802543 | 17.07.2015 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201514604272 | 23.01.2015 | US201514967313 | 13.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101993038B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2019 | B1 | KR20160111500 | 26.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018503927 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14642 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017504126 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3443480 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US27819 | 14.04.2017 | US201662322740 | 14.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3248166 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14641 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3097532 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2017 | A4 | EP3097532 | 30.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2973049 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | A4 | EP2973049 | 20.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US30825 | 17.03.2014 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2972978 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | A4 | EP2972978 | 20.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US30728 | 17.03.2014 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107851283 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14642 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106462898 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2974701 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14642 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2924083 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | C | CA2924083 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US30728 | 17.03.2014 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216390 | 17.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2906232 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | C | CA2906232 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361801959 | 15.03.2013 | US201414216936 | 17.03.2014 | WO2014US30825 | 17.03.2014 | US201361802245 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019202967 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2020 | A2 | AU2019202967 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2015209151 | 23.01.2015 | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | AU2019202967 | 29.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019101760 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2020 | A4 | Priority number | Date | AU2015209151 | 23.01.2015 | AU2019101760 | 29.04.2019 | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016209034 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14642 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015209151 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2937313 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1251337 | 25.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14642 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2016009632 | 09.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017009546 | 09.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14642 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201903568T | 30.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201605968V | 30.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461930807 | 23.01.2014 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201705946V | 30.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US14642 | 23.01.2016 | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI567679B | 21.01.2017 | B | TW201643800 | 16.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016118939 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016118938 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016102483 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2021 | A4 | Priority number | Date | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3048575 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202016009077U | 14.12.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 |