EP3048575 - SEGMENTATION AND STRATIFICATION OF COMPOSITE PORTFOLIOS OF INVESTMENT SECURITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riggs, Rory 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riggs, Rory 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 02 /
Remmel, Harmon 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 03 /
Goldman, Daniel 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 04 /
Silkworth, Christopher 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 05 /
Chandler, Jonathan 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 06 /
Fifield, James 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 07 /
Fuller, Adelaide 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 08 /
Sandys, Sean 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 09 /
Marius, Gabriel 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | 10 /
Finn, Mark 179 Franklin Street 3rd Floor New York, New York 10013 / US | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | sgb europe Bergstrasse 31 82069 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Dienwiebel, Thomas Dienwiebel Transatlantic Intellectual Property Lechnerstraße 25a 82067 Ebenhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16152497.0 | 23.01.2016 | [2016/30] | Priority number, date | US201514604197 | 23.01.2015 Original published format: US201514604197 | WO2015US12762 | 23.01.2015 Original published format: PCT/US2015/012762 | US201514801775 | 16.07.2015 Original published format: US201514801775 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048575 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/06 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
G06Q40/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2016/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEGMENTIERUNG UND STRATIFIZIERUNG VON ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN PORTFOLIOS VON ANLAGEPAPIEREN | [2016/30] | English: | SEGMENTATION AND STRATIFICATION OF COMPOSITE PORTFOLIOS OF INVESTMENT SECURITIES | [2016/30] | French: | COMPOSITE DE SEGMENTATION ET DE STRATIFICATION DE PORTEFEUILLES DE TITRES DE PLACEMENT | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2019 | 25.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/18] | 23.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed | by applicant | US8306892 | US8131620 | US8005740 | - CARHART, M. M., "On Persistence in Mutual Fund Performance", THE JOURNAL OF FINANCE, (1997), vol. 52, pages 57 - 82 |