EP3050453 - FLEXIBLE ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR AND RELATED METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolverine Outdoors, Inc. 9341 Courtland Drive, NE Rockford, MI 49351 / US | [2020/49] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Wolverine Outdoors, Inc. 9341 Courtland Drive, NE Rockford MI 49351 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENEY, James H. 121 Howard Street Northborough, MA 01532 / US | 02 /
THORPE, David 438 Main Street Action, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
LAZELL, Alan Yi Feng Cui Yun Xuan Garden, Room 3-2-903 DongSheng Road, HengKeng Village, LiaoBu Town 523000 Dongguan City / CN | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/31] | Lewin, David Nicholas Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 16152832.8 | 26.01.2016 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | US201514609828 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: US201514609828 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050453 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3050453 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/14, A43B13/38, A43B9/00, // A43B13/12, A43B13/22 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A43B13/141 (EP,US);
A43B13/14 (CN);
A43B13/12 (EP,US);
A43B13/223 (EP,US);
A43B13/26 (EP,US);
A43B13/28 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE SCHUHWERK UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2016/31] | English: | FLEXIBLE ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR AND RELATED METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [2016/31] | French: | ARTICLE FLEXIBLE DE CHAUSSURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 31.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 25.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2016 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | MT | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | TR | 02.12.2020 | IE | 26.01.2021 | LU | 26.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 26.01.2016 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
TR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.01.2016 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 26.01.2016 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 26.01.2016 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 26.01.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 26.01.2021 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB190925198 (PARKER JOSEPH HIRAM) [Y] 7-11 * the whole document *; | [XI]US4676010 (CHESKIN MELVYN P [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-7 * [I] 4,6,7,11-15; | [IA]US5983529 (SERNA RALPH [US]) [I] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 59 - column 8, line 58; figures 1A-4 * [A] 7,10-15; | [XAI]US6412196 (GROSS ALEXANDER L [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 7,11-15 [I] 4,6; | [XYI]US2008229617 (JOHNSON DANIEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0026] - [0059]; figures 1-15 * [Y] 7-11 [I] 12-15; | [A]EP2238848 (CALZADOS HERGAR SA [ES]) [A] 1,7,12* paragraphs [0014] - [0019]; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2014259744 (COOPER AARON AC [US]) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6,7,11-15 |