EP3031520 - AGITATION MIXING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTSUKA, Masaki C/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha, 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
KITATANI, Kazuya C/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha, 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16153125.6 | 03.04.2009 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | JP20080099136 | 07.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008099136 | JP20080101245 | 09.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008101245 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3031520 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01F11/00, B01F15/00, B01F3/08, A01J11/10, A01J15/26 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
A01J11/10 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP,US);
A01J15/26 (EP,US);
B01F31/441 (EP,US);
B01F31/449 (EP,US);
B01F35/32021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2016/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHÜTTELMISCHVORRICHTUNG | [2016/24] | English: | AGITATION MIXING APPARATUS | [2016/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE MÉLANGE À AGITATION | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 23.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09729771.7 / EP2263786 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2433248 (SWEIER JR GEORGE D) [X] 1-7,11 * column 1, line 19 - line 49; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 12; | [X]US4332482 (ENGLER KEVIN G) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0010883 (ONO SOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A]DE854647 (OTTO LYNKER G M B H) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3715105 (REUBEN T) [A] 1,12 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | JPH0751557 | JPH1157441 | JP2005053582 | JPH02150023U |