EP3064508 - METHOD OF PRODUCING RECOMBINANT HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT VWF IN CELL CULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Zählerweg 4 6300 Zug / CH | ||
For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | |||
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark, Opfikon / CH | ||
For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grillberger, Leopold Finsterergasse 1a 1220 Vienna / AT | 02 /
Reiter, Manfred Gebrueder-Lang-Gasse 11/17 1150 Vienna / AT | 03 /
Mundt, Wolfgang Florianigasse 57/1/2/6 1080 Vienna / AT | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 16153131.4 | 08.07.2011 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | US20100362635P | 08.07.2010 Original published format: US 362635 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064508 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3064508 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3064508 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/755, C12N5/00, A61K38/36, C12N5/10, A61K39/00, C12N9/64, A61K38/00, A61K38/37, A61K9/00, C12P21/00 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/755 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
C12N5/0018 (EA,IL,KR);
A61K9/0019 (EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/36 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/37 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,EA,IL);
A61P33/06 (EP,EA,IL);
A61P7/00 (EP,EA,IL);
A61P7/04 (EP,EA,IL);
C07K1/00 (EA,IL);
C07K14/745 (EA,IL);
C12N5/00 (EA,IL);
C12N5/10 (EA,IL);
C12N9/6489 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
C12P21/00 (EA,IL,KR,US);
C12Y304/24087 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
C12N2500/10 (EA,IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | C07K14/755, C12N5/00, A61K38/36, C12N5/10, A61K39/00, C12N9/64, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REKOMBINANTEM VWF MIT HOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT IN EINER ZELLKULTUR | [2016/36] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING RECOMBINANT HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT VWF IN CELL CULTURE | [2016/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE VWF DE POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE ÉLEVÉ RECOMBINANT DANS UNE CULTURE CELLULAIRE | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2019 | Observations by third parties | 04.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11736502.3 / EP2590998 | Divisional application(s) | EP19191438.1 / EP3626736 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.05.2020
30.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE James Poole Limited One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/37] |
Former [2020/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.05.2020
30.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE James Poole Limited One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB Opponent's representative Wise, Daniel Joseph Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 16.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.10.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.05.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.07.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.02.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | LU | 08.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4767704 (CLEVELAND WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, paragraph 67 * * column 6, lines 19-28 *; | [A]EP1096017 (WELFIDE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0015] - [0017] - [0020] , [0030] , [0031] , [0039] , [0040] *; | [X]WO2008082669 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS AL CORP [US], et al) [X] 8-15* p.71 par.271p.72 Tbl.3, p.73 Tbl.4, p.69 par.263, p.74 Par.282-285 *; | [A]WO2008109410 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0058] , [0081] , [0107] *; | [YD]WO2009086309 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [YD] 1-3,5-7 * page 2, line 10 * * page 9, line 10 * * page 10, lines 11-26 * * page 14, line 17 * * page 15, line 30 * * page 16, lines 9-14 * * page 17, line 28 *; | [Y] - M.-S. LAO ET AL, "Effects of Ammonium and Lactate on Growth and Metabolism of a Recombinant Chinese Hamster Ovary Cell Culture", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (19971007), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1021/bp9602360, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 688 - 691, XP055115728 [Y] 1-3,5-7 * Pg.689 Col.1 Par.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp9602360 | by applicant | WO8606096 | EP0481791 | WO9615231 | WO9626266 | WO9808934 | WO9815614 | US5804420 | US5994136 | US6013516 | WO0003000 | US6100061 | WO0123527 | US2007212770 | WO2009086309 | - FRANEK ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 688 - 692 | - K. G. MANN ET AL., BLOOD, (1990), vol. 76, pages 1 - 16 | - "Hemophilia A, Hemophilia B, and von Willebrand's Disease", J. E. SADLER; E. W. DAVIE ET AL., The molecular basis of blood diseases, W.B. SAUNDERS CO., (1987), pages 576 - 602 | - CASTAMAN, DISORDERS OF HEMOSTASIS, (2003), vol. 88, no. 1, pages 94 - 108 | - EIKENBOOM ET AL., HAEMOPHILIA, (1995), vol. 1, pages 77 - 90 | - MAYADAS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, no. 23, pages 13497 - 13503 | - NICHOLSON ET AL., BMC EVOL BIOL., (20050204), vol. 5, no. 1, page 11 | - JONES GC, CURR PHARM BIOTECHNOL., (200602), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 25 - 31 | - MOAKE JL, SEMIN HEMATOL., (200401), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 4 - 14 | - LARKIN ET AL., PLOS PATHOG., (200903), vol. 5, no. 3, page EL000349 | - CHAUHAN, J EXP MED., (20080901), vol. 205, no. 9, pages 2065 - 2074 | - LARKIN ET AL., PLOS PATHOG., (200903), vol. 5, no. 3, page E1000349 | - LEVY ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 413, pages 488 - 494 | - FUJIKAWA, BLOOD, (2001), vol. 98, pages 1662 - 1666 | - ZHENG, J BIOL CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 41059 - 41063 | - SOEJIMA ET AL., J BIOCHEM (TOKYO, (2001), vol. 130, pages 475 - 480 | - GERRITSEN ET AL., BLOOD, (2001), vol. 98, pages 1654 - 1661 | - PLAIMAUER ET AL., BLOOD, (20011215), vol. 100, no. 10, pages 3626 - 3632 | - PLAIMAUER B; SCHEIFLINGER F., SEMIN HEMATOL., (200401), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 24 - 33 | - WEISS ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1973), vol. 52, pages 2708 - 2716 | - MACFARLANE ET AL., THROMB. DIATH. HAEMORRH., (1975), vol. 34, pages 306 - 308 | - KOKAME ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL., (200504), vol. 129, no. 1, pages 93 - 100 | - TRIPODI ET AL., J THROMB HAEMOST., (200809), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 1534 - 1541 | - GERRITSEN, "Assay of von Willebrand factor (vWF)-cleaving protease based on decreased collagen binding affinity of degraded vWF: a tool for the diagnosis of thrombotic thrombocytopenic purpura (TTP", THROMB HAEMOST, (1999), vol. 82, pages 1386 - 1389 | - RIEGER ET AL., THROMB HAEMOST. 2006, (2006), vol. 95, no. 2, pages 212 - 220 | - VAN WEZEL, A.L., NATURE, (1967), vol. 216, pages 64 - 65 | - BUTLER, Animal Cell Biotechnology, (1988), vol. 3, pages 283 - 303 | - KAUFMAN, MOL CELL BIOL., (198903), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 1233 - 1242 | - URIAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD, (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., Annals N. Y. Acad. Sci., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - PLAIMAUER, BLOOD, (20020712), vol. 100, no. 10, pages 3626 - 3632 | - REITER ET AL., LMMUNO AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | - GRUNHAUS ET AL., SEMINAR IN VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 200, no. 2, pages 535 - 546 | - KELLEHER; VOS, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 1110 - 1117 | - COTTEN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, no. 13, pages 6094 - 6098 | - CURIEL, NAT IMMUN, (1994), vol. 13, no. 2-3, pages 141 - 164 | - MUZYCZKA, CURR TOP MICROBIOL IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 158, pages 97 - 129 | - MANN ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 153 - 159 | - NICOLAS; RUBINSTEIN, Vectors: A survey of molecular cloning vectors and their uses, BUTTERWORTH, (1988), pages 494 - 513 | - TEMIN, Gene Transfer, PLENUM PRESS, (1986), pages 149 - 188 | - NALDINI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 272, no. 5259, pages 263 - 267 | - ZUFFEREY, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 871 - 875 | - BLOMER ET AL., J VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, no. 9, pages 6641 - 6649 | - FLANNERY C.R., FRONT BIOSCI., (20060101), vol. 11, pages 544 - 569 | - APTE S.S., J BIOL CHEM., (20091113), vol. 284, no. 46, pages 31493 - 31497 | - ANDREINI ET AL., J. PROTEOME RES., (2005), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 881 - 888 | - LIN; LIU, OPEN ACCESS RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH AND REVIEWS, (2009), vol. 1, pages 121 - 131 | - TANG ET AL., PHARM RES., (2004), vol. 21, pages 191 - 200 | - CHANG ET AL., PHARM RES., (1996), vol. 13, pages 243 - 249 | - CHEN, DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, (1992), vol. 18, pages 1311 - 1354 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1990), pages 1435 - 1712 | Opposition | US4767704 | EP1096017 | WO2008082669 | WO2008109410 | WO2009086309 | - M.-S. Lao, D. Toth, "Effects of Ammonium and Lactate on Growth and Metabolism of a Recombinant Chinese Hamster Ovary Cell Culture", Biotechnology Progress, American Chemical Society, (19971007), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1021/bp9602360, ISSN 87567938, pages 688 - 691, XP055115728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp9602360 | - Fatemeh Davami, Farnaz Eghbalpour, Leila Nematollahi, Farzaneh Barkhordari, Fereidoun Mahboudi, "Effects of Peptone Supplementation in Different Culture Media on Growth, Metabolic Pathway and Productivity of CHO DG44 Cells; a New Insight into Amino Acid Profiles", Iranian biomedical journal, Pasteur Institute of Iran, Iran, Iran, doi:10.7508/ibj.2015.04.002, (20150101), pages 194 - 205, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC4649854/pdf/ibj-19-194.pdf, XP055750435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7508/ibj.2015.04.002 | - Y Sakai, Et Al, "GROWTH INHIBITION AND HEAVY METAL ACCUMULATION IN CHO CELLS", Animal Cell Technology: Developments towards the 21st Century, Kluwer, (19950101), pages 1111 - 1115, XP055750458 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-94-011-0437-1_174 | - Claudia Altamirano, Et Al, "Advances in improving mammalian cells metabolism for recombinant protein production", EJB ELECTRONIC JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, CONICYT, SANTIAGO, CL, CL, vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.2225/vol16-issue3-fulltext-2, ISSN 0717-3458, pages 1 - 14, XP055750886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2225/vol16-issue3-fulltext-2 | - J E Sadler, "von Willebrand factor assembly and secretion", Journal of Thrombosis and Haemostasis, (20090101), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 24 - 27, XP055750907 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1538-7836.2009.03375.x | - D D Wagner, T Mayadas, V J Marder, "Initial glycosylation and acidic pH in the Golgi apparatus are required for multimerization of von Willebrand factor.", The journal of cell biology, The Rockefeller University Press, US, US, (19860401), vol. 102, no. 4, doi:10.1083/jcb.102.4.1320, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 1320 - 1324, XP055750915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.102.4.1320 | - MAYADAS T.N., WAGNER D.D., "IN VITRO MULTIMERIZATION OF VON WILLEBRAND FACTOR IS TRIGGERED BY LOW PH.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19890101), vol. 264., no. 23., ISSN 0021-9258, page 13497 + 503., XP000885940 | - KAUFMAN, R.J. ET AL., "Effect of von Willebrand factor coexpression on the synthesis and secretion of Factor VIII in Chinese Hamster Ovary cells", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (19890301), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 1233 - 1242, XP002440263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.9.3.1233 | - VOORBERG J , FONTIJN R, MOURIK VAN J A, PANNEKOEK H, "DOMAINS INVOLVED IN MULTIMER ASSEMBLY OF VON WILLEBRAND FACTOR VWF MULTIMERIZATION IS INDEPENDENT OF DIMERIZATION", The EMBO Journal, European Molecular Biology Organization, (19900101), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 797 - 803, XP002674469 | - DMEM/F-12 media components | - M.-S. Lao, D. Toth, "Effects of Ammonium and Lactate on Growth and Metabolism of a Recombinant Chinese Hamster Ovary Cell Culture", Biotechnology Progress, American Chemical Society, (19971007), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1021/bp9602360, ISSN 87567938, pages 688 - 691 | - Fatemeh Davami, Farnaz Eghbalpour, Leila Nematollahi, Farzaneh Barkhordari, Fereidoun Mahboudi, "Effects of Peptone Supplementation in Different Culture Media on Growth, Metabolic Pathway and Productivity of CHO DG44 Cells; a New Insight into Amino Acid Profiles", Iranian biomedical journal, Pasteur Institute of Iran, Iran, Iran, doi:10.7508/ibj.2015.04.002, (20150101), pages 194 - 205, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC4649854/pdf/ibj-19-194.pdf | - Y Sakai, Et Al, "GROWTH INHIBITION AND HEAVY METAL ACCUMULATION IN CHO CELLS", Animal Cell Technology: Developments towards the 21st Century, Kluwer, (19950101), pages 1111 - 1115 | - Claudia Altamirano, Et Al, "Advances in improving mammalian cells metabolism for recombinant protein production", EJB ELECTRONIC JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, CONICYT, SANTIAGO, CL, CL, vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.2225/vol16-issue3-fulltext-2, ISSN 0717-3458, pages 1 - 14 | - J E Sadler, "von Willebrand factor assembly and secretion", Journal of Thrombosis and Haemostasis, (20090101), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 24 - 27 | - D D Wagner, T Mayadas, V J Marder, "Initial glycosylation and acidic pH in the Golgi apparatus are required for multimerization of von Willebrand factor.", The journal of cell biology, The Rockefeller University Press, US, US, (19860401), vol. 102, no. 4, doi:10.1083/jcb.102.4.1320, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 1320 - 1324 | - MAYADAS T.N., WAGNER D.D., "IN VITRO MULTIMERIZATION OF VON WILLEBRAND FACTOR IS TRIGGERED BY LOW PH.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19890101), vol. 264., no. 23., ISSN 0021-9258, page 13497 + 503. | - KAUFMAN, R.J. ET AL., "Effect of von Willebrand factor coexpression on the synthesis and secretion of Factor VIII in Chinese Hamster Ovary cells", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (19890301), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 1233 - 1242 | - VOORBERG J , FONTIJN R, MOURIK VAN J A, PANNEKOEK H, "DOMAINS INVOLVED IN MULTIMER ASSEMBLY OF VON WILLEBRAND FACTOR VWF MULTIMERIZATION IS INDEPENDENT OF DIMERIZATION", The EMBO Journal, European Molecular Biology Organization, (19900101), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 797 - 803 |