EP3034608 - MICE EXPRESSING AN IMMUNOGLOBULIN HYBRID LIGHT CHAIN WITH A HUMAN VARIABLE REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/25] | MICE EXPRESSING AN IMMUNOGLOBULIN HYBRID LIGHT CHAIN | ||
[2018/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACDONALD, Lynn 16 Gedney Way White Plains, NY 10605 / US | 02 /
STEVENS, Sean 355 Berry Street 413 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 03 /
GURER, Cagan 8 Pamela Lane Valhalla, NY 10595 / US | 04 /
MURPHY, Andrew J. 10 Newton Court Croton-on-Hudson, NY 10520 / US | 05 /
HOSIAWA, Karolina A. 14 Church Street 2nd Floor Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/25] | Power, David J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16154526.4 | 22.06.2011 | [2016/25] | Priority number, date | US20100357317P | 22.06.2010 Original published format: US 357317 P | US20100357314P | 22.06.2010 Original published format: US 357314 P | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3034608 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3034608 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85, A01K67/027, C07K16/00, C07K16/46, C07K16/18, C12N15/10 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C12N15/10 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N5/0606 (IL,US);
A01K67/027 (RU);
A01K67/0278 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,RU,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07K16/46 (RU);
C07K16/461 (EP,RU,US);
C07K16/462 (EP,RU,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A01K2207/15 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A01K2217/05 (IL,RU,US);
A01K2217/052 (RU,US);
A01K2217/07 (KR);
A01K2217/072 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A01K2217/15 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A01K2267/02 (EP,RU,US);
A01K2267/0381 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/10 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/50 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/515 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,RU,US);
C07K2317/64 (RU,US);
C12N2015/8518 (KR);
C12N2800/30 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2016/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 22.12.2016 | ME | 22.12.2016 | Title | German: | MÄUSE, DIE EINER HYBRIDEN LEICHTEN KETTE MIT MENSCHLICHER LAMBDA-VARIABLE EXPRIMIEREN | [2018/10] | English: | MICE EXPRESSING AN IMMUNOGLOBULIN HYBRID LIGHT CHAIN WITH A HUMAN VARIABLE REGION | [2018/10] | French: | SOURIS EXPRIMANT UNE CHAÎNE LÉGÈRE HYBRIDE D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE COMPRENANT UNE RÉGION VARIABLE HUMAINE | [2018/10] |
Former [2016/25] | MÄUSE ZUR EXPRESSION VON LEICHTER HYBRIDIMMUNOGLOBULINKETTEN | ||
Former [2016/25] | MICE EXPRESSING AN IMMUNOGLOBULIN HYBRID LIGHT CHAIN | ||
Former [2016/25] | SOURIS EXPRIMANT UNE CHAÎNE LÉGÈRE D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE HYBRIDE | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 16.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11728509.8 / EP2480676 | Divisional application(s) | EP18202954.6 / EP3456832 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.01.2019 | [2022/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0026373 (BABRAHAM INST [GB], et al); | [A]US2002026036 (SHITARA KENYA [JP], et al); | [A]US2003217373 (GREEN LARRY L [US], et al); | [A]US2006015957 (LONBERG NILS [US], et al); | [A]WO2008054606 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al); | [A]WO2009143472 (ALIVA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010039900 (ALIVA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [AP]WO2011004192 (GENOME RES LTD [GB], et al); | [T]WO2011163314 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al); | by applicant | US6586251 | US6596541 | US6774279 | US6998514 | US7294754 | US7435871 | US7605237 |