EP3056811 - METHOD FOR COOLING SOLID RESIDUES OF A COMBUSTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Zosen Inova AG Hardturmstrasse 127 8005 Zürich / CH | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tran, Nicolas Kanzleistrasse 200 8004 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Brennwald, Werner Rosenweg 1 8413 Neftenbach / CH | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 16154630.4 | 08.02.2016 | [2016/33] | Priority number, date | EP20150000394 | 10.02.2015 Original published format: EP 15000394 | [2016/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3056811 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3056811 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F23J1/02, F27D15/02, F28F13/02, F28D21/00 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
F23J1/02 (EP,US);
F23J3/00 (US);
F27D15/0213 (EP,US);
F27D15/0266 (EP,US);
F28F13/02 (EP,US);
F23J2900/01002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG VON FESTSTOFFRÜCKSTÄNDEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSPROZESSES | [2016/33] | English: | METHOD FOR COOLING SOLID RESIDUES OF A COMBUSTION PROCESS | [2016/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE RÉSIDUS SOLIDES D'UN PROCESSUS DE COMBUSTION | [2019/10] |
Former [2016/33] | PROCEDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE RESIDUS SOLIDES D'UN PROCESSUS DE COMBUSTION | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2016 | AL | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IE | 08.02.2020 | LU | 08.02.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 08.02.2016 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IE | 08.02.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IE | 08.02.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IE | 08.02.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 09.10.2019 | |
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 09.10.2019 | |
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 09.10.2019 | |
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]NL1018683C (VERMEULEN ANTHONIUS HENDRICUS [NL]) [AD] 1-15* page 3, lines 14-17; figure -; claim 7 *; | [AD]DE102009060305 (CLYDE BERGEMANN DRYCON GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0 14]; figure - * | Examination | US1844782 | by applicant | EP0252967 | NL1018683C | DE102009060305 | EP2665971 | EP2778523 |